EP1015182 - BRAZED DIAMOND TOOLS BY INFILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sung, Chien-Min 4, Lane 32, Chung-Cheng Road Tansui Taipei County 251 / TW | [2006/04] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Sung, Chien-Min 4, Lane 32, Chung-Cheng Road Tansui, Taipei County 251 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/27] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde, Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98912072.0 | 26.03.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US05988 | Priority number, date | US19970835117 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: US 835117 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9845091 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1015182 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015182 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B24D17/00, B24D3/08, B24D7/06 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B24D18/00 (EP,US);
B24D11/00 (KR);
B24D3/08 (EP,US);
B24D5/12 (EP,US);
B24D99/005 (EP,US);
B28D1/12 (EP,US);
C04B35/52 (EP,US);
C22C1/1015 (EP,US);
C22C26/00 (EP,US);
B01J2203/0645 (EP,US);
B01J2203/066 (EP,US);
B01J2203/0685 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F3/26, C22C1/1036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | B24D17/00, B24D3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | GELÖTETE DIAMANTWERKZEUGE DURCH INFILTRATION | [2005/36] | English: | BRAZED DIAMOND TOOLS BY INFILTRATION | [2000/27] | French: | OUTILS AU DIAMANT BRASES PAR INFILTRATION | [2000/27] |
Former [2000/27] | INFILTRATIONSAUGELÖTETEN DIAMANTWERKZEUGE | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 29.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05077485.0 / EP1645365 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.01.2006 | SE | 25.04.2006 | GR | 26.04.2006 | PT | 26.06.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | FR | 31.03.2006 | |
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | SE | 25.04.2006 | |
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 25.04.2006 | |
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SE | 25.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3127715 (CHRISTENSEN FRANK L) [Y] 1-34* figure - *; | [Y]US4664705 (HORTON M DUANE [US], et al) [Y] 1-34 * claim - *; | [Y]US4925457 (DEKOK PETER T [US], et al) [Y] 1-34 * figure - *; | [Y]EP0374515 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-34 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 33 *; | [Y]EP0374424 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-34 * abstract *; | [Y]US5022895 (WIAND RONALD C [US]) [Y] 1-34 * column 4, lines 12-18 *; | [Y]US5049165 (TSELESIN NAUM N [US]) [Y] 1-34 * figure - *; | [Y]EP0688634 (NORTON CO [US]) [Y] 1-34 * column 1, lines 8-12; claim 3 * | International search | [A]US4669522 (GRIFFIN NIGEL D [GB]); | [A]US4780274 (BARR JOHN D [GB]); | [X]US5000273 (HORTON RALPH M [US], et al); | [A]US5518443 (FISHER KAWIKA S [US]) | Examination | US2876086 | US5190598 | WO9427833 |