EP0972386 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPDATING AND SYNCHRONIZING INFORMATION BETWEEN A CLIENT AND A SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLE COMPUTER, INC. M/S 38-PAT, 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states APPLE COMPUTER, INC. M/S 38-PAT, 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERRIS, Michael c/o Apple Computer Inc. 1 Infinite Loop,M/S:38-PAT Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
POPP, Nicolas 196 Santa Monica Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
FORSTALL, Scott 2349 Greer Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 04 /
D'HARCOURT, Charles 571 Haight Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | [2001/39] |
Former [2000/03] | 01 /
FERRIS, Michael 434 Sunny Slope Oakland, CA 94610 / US | ||
02 /
POPP, Nicolas 196 Santa Monica Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
FORSTALL, Scott 2349 Greer Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
04 /
D'HARCOURT, Charles 571 Haight Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98912123.1 | 30.03.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998US06227 | Priority number, date | US19970825538 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: US 825538 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844695 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972386 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972386 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/46, H04L29/06 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G06F9/44526 (EP,US);
G06F40/103 (US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F9/54 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2000/03] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG UND ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ZWISCHEN EINEM KLIENT UND EINEM SERVER | [2000/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPDATING AND SYNCHRONIZING INFORMATION BETWEEN A CLIENT AND A SERVER | [2000/03] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT UNE MISE A JOUR ET UN SYNCHRONISATION DE L'INFORMATION ENTRE UN UTILISATEUR ET UN SERVEUR ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - DUAN N N, "Distributed database access in a corporate environment using Java", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (199605), vol. 28, no. 11, page 1149-1156, XP004018216 [A] 1,17 * abstract * * page 1149, column L, paragraph 1 - page 1155, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(96)00047-5 | [A] - JACOBS S ET AL, "Filling HTML forms simultaneously: CoWeb - architecture and functionality", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (199605), vol. 28, no. 11, page 1385-1395, XP004018236 [A] 1,17 * abstract * * page 1385, column L, paragraph 1 - page 1388, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(96)00054-2 |