EP0973492 - ANTIPERSPIRANT STICK WITH IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINN, Elizabeth 621 Fifth Avenue Lyndhurst, NJ 07071 / US | 02 /
POTECHIN, Kathy, J. 15 Spenser Drive Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2003/15] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/04] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 98912132.2 | 27.03.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US06286 | Priority number, date | US19970829399 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: US 829399 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843605 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973492 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973492 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q15/00, A61K8/28, A61K8/34, A61K8/39, A61K8/86, A61K8/92, A61K8/58 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/0229 (EP,US);
A61K8/28 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/04] | A61K7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Extension states | RO | 18.10.1999 | Title | German: | ANTITRANSPIRANT-STIFTE MIT VERBESSERTEN KENNZEICHEN | [2000/04] | English: | ANTIPERSPIRANT STICK WITH IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS | [2000/04] | French: | BATON ANTISUDORIFIQUE AUX PROPRIETES AMELIOREES | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2010
08.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
31.03.2010
23.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB Opponent's representative McHugh, Paul Edward, et al, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2010
08.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
31.03.2010
23.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB Opponent's representative McHugh, Paul Edward, et al, et al Unilever Patent Group Unilever Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | |||
Former [2010/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2010
08.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
31.03.2010
23.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB Opponent's representative Whaley, Christopher, et al, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | |||
Former [2010/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
31.03.2010
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB Opponent's representative Pugh, Robert Ian, et al, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk GB-Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | 12.05.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.11.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.09.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 24.09.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/53] | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 26.01.2012 | Appeal received No. T0142/12 | 03.04.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.09.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.01.2012 | Appeal received No. T0142/12 | 27.03.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.09.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 24.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | IE | 27.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | IT | 27.03.2015 | [2016/03] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4919934 (DECKNER GEORGE E [US], et al) [AD] 1* example 1 *; | [X]US5531986 (SHEVADE MAKARAND [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 5; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2299024 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [X] 1-36 * page 11, lines 24-34; claim 1 *; | [PX]WO9734577 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [PX] 1 * example B; claim 1 *; | [PX]WO9748373 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * page 26, line 25 - page 28, line 2; example 8; claim 1 * |