EP0970067 - (METHYLSULFONYL)PHENYL-2-(5H)-FURANONES WITH OXYGEN LINK AS COX-2 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Frosst Canada & Co. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Merck Frosst Canada & Co. 16711 Trans Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBLANC, Yves 16711 Trans Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 02 /
ROY, Patrick 16711 Trans Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebc H9H 3L1 / CA | 03 /
LEGER, Serge 16711 Trans Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 04 /
GRIMM, Erich 16711 Trans Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 05 /
WANG, Zhaoyin 16711 Trans Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2000/02] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98912164.5 | 12.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998CA00225 | Priority number, date | US19970040794P | 14.03.1997 Original published format: US 40794 P | GB19970007488 | 14.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9707488 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841516 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970067 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970067 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/60, C07D407/12, A61K31/34 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C07D407/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D307/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | (METHYLSULFONYL)PHENYL-2-(5H)-FURANONE MIT SAUERSTOFF-BINDUNG ALS COX-2-HEMMER | [2000/02] | English: | (METHYLSULFONYL)PHENYL-2-(5H)-FURANONES WITH OXYGEN LINK AS COX-2 INHIBITORS | [2000/02] | French: | (METHYLSUFONYL)PHENYL-2-(5H)-FURANONES A LIAISON OXYGENE, UTILISEES COMME INHIBITEURS DE CYCLO-OXYGENASE-2 | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/02] | (METHYLSUFONYL)PHENYL-2-(5H)-FURANONES A LIAISON OXYGENE, UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE CYCLO-OXYGENASE-2 | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 14.03.2002 | Appeal received | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.2003 | BE | 02.07.2003 | CH | 02.07.2003 | FI | 02.07.2003 | LI | 02.07.2003 | NL | 02.07.2003 | DK | 02.10.2003 | GR | 02.10.2003 | PT | 02.10.2003 | SE | 02.10.2003 | IE | 12.03.2004 | LU | 12.03.2004 | [2005/24] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
LU | 12.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0551385 ; | [Y]WO9608482 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,9,10,13-15 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 8 * * see page 3, formula I and definition of substituents *; | [Y]WO9619469 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1,3,9,10,13-15 * claims 1-5,20,21,25-29; table - *; | [A]EP0754687 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [A] 1-7,9,10,13-15 * claims 1,17,27-33; table - *; | [PX]WO9714691 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-3,9,10,13-15 * see page 111, example 134; page 112, examples 140, 141, 143, 144; page 113, examples 146-149; page 117, examples 173, 174; page 118, examples 177-179; * * page 122, example 206; page 123, examples 207, 208 * * claims 1,17,18,29,30,35-39 *; | [PX]WO9716435 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-3 * see page 34, example 39 *; | [PX]WO9728121 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-3 * see page 31, compound 7 *; | [PX]WO9745420 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,9,10,13-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 8 * * page 3, line 2 - line 18 * * see page 29, compound Ia * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930708), vol. 17, no. 361, Database accession no. (C - 1080), & JP05051385 A 19930302 (SANKYO CO LTD) [A] 1 * see formula II * |