blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968588

EP0968588 - SERVICE LEVEL AGREEMENT MANAGEMENT IN DATA NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CROSSKEYS SYSTEMS CORPORATION
350 Terry Fox Drive Kanata
Ontario K2K 2W5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
CROSSKEYS SYSTEMS CORPORATION
350 Terry Fox Drive
Kanata Ontario K2K 2W5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / FORGET, Leo
55 Forest Creek
Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1M1 / CA
02 / CHRISTMAS, Mark
13 Riding Way
Kanata, Ontario K2M 1C3 / CA
[2000/01]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2003/11]
Former [2000/01]McLean, Robert Andreas, et al
Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
Application number, filing date98912167.816.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998CA00232
Priority number, dateCA1997220000914.03.1997         Original published format: CA 2200009
CA1997220001114.03.1997         Original published format: CA 2200011
US19970043080P08.04.1997         Original published format: US 43080 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842102
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968588
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/24, H04Q11/04
[2000/01]
CPC:
H04Q11/0478 (EP); H04L41/5003 (EP); H04L41/5009 (EP);
H04L41/5032 (EP); H04L41/5067 (EP); H04L2012/5626 (EP);
H04L2012/5631 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNG VON DIENSTSTUFENÜBEREINKOMMEN IN DATENNETZEN[2000/01]
English:SERVICE LEVEL AGREEMENT MANAGEMENT IN DATA NETWORKS[2000/01]
French:GESTION D'AGREMENT DE NIVEAU DE SERVICE DANS DES RESEAUX DE DONNEES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase29.09.1999National basic fee paid 
29.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
02.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
05.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9607281  (BRITISH TELECOMM ;AZARMI NADER (GB); CORLEY STEPHEN LESLIE (GB)) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11,12 * page 6, line 7 - line 10 * * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 4 * * page 30, line 14 - page 35, line 17 *;
 [A]WO9626588  (CALBETRON SYSTEMS INC) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 18 - page 2, line 28 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 6 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 1 *;
 [A]  - HINCHLIFFE M ET AL, "CUSTOMER NETWORK MANAGEMENT AND ATM NETWORKS", 1996 IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOMS), KYOTO, APR. 15 - 19, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960415), VOL. 1, no. SYMP. 5, pages 155 - 164, XP000641088 [A] 1-14 * page 157, line 1 - line 8 * * page 161, line 26 - page 162, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.1996.539455
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.