Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0918937
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.04.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] |
02.04.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
10.01.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
08.01.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
26.07.2002 |
First examination report |
|
22.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.07.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
16.04.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
31.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|