EP1010171 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONOUSLY READING MULTIPLE TRACKS OF AN OPTICAL STORAGE MEDIUM USING MULTIPLE READING BEAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zen Research (Ireland), Ltd. Century House, Harold's Cross Road Dublin 6W / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Zen Research, (Ireland) Ltd. Century House, Harold's Cross Road Dublin 6W / IE | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states ZEN RESEARCH N.V. Van Engelenweg 21 A Curacao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALON, Amir 837 Duncardine Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
FINKELSTEIN, Jacob Hameyasdim Street 10B 44219 Kfar Saba / IL | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98912351.8 | 20.02.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998EP00983 | Priority number, date | US19970804105 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: US 804105 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9837554 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1010171 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
G11B20/1403 (EP,US);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/10259 (EP,US);
G11B20/1426 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
G11B7/131 (EP,US);
G11B7/14 (EP,US);
G11B20/22 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SYNCHRONISIERTEN LESEN MEHRERER SPUREN EINES OPTISCHEN SPEICHERMEDIUMS DURCH MEHRERE ABLESESTRAHLEN | [2002/43] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONOUSLY READING MULTIPLE TRACKS OF AN OPTICAL STORAGE MEDIUM USING MULTIPLE READING BEAMS | [2000/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE SYNCHRONE DE PLUSIEURS PISTES D'UN MILIEU DE STOCKAGE OPTIQUE, A L'AIDE DE PLUSIEURS FAISCEAUX DE LECTURE | [2000/25] |
Former [2000/25] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SYNCHRONISIERTEN LESEN MEHERER SPUREN EINES OPTISCHEN SPEICHERMEDIUMS DURCH MEHRER ABLESERSTRAHLEN | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6180563 ; | [YA]EP0089264 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [Y] 4,6,14 * the whole document * [A] 5,7,8,15,16; | [A]GB2188474 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [A] 21-32* page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 6 *; | [XY]EP0506447 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 21-24,26-30 * page 4, line 58 - page 8, line 13; figure 3 * [Y] 25,31,32; | [X]EP0569718 (ALON AMIR [IL], et al) [X] 21,22,24,26-28 * abstract * * page 5, line 38 - page 6, line 35 * * page 7, line 45 - page 8, line 8; figure 8 *; | [A]EP0598611 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9,10,12,17,18 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [XAY]US5347506 (MATSUDO YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 5,7,8,10,15,16,18-20 [Y] 4,6,9,14,17; | [YA]EP0643388 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9,17 * abstract * * column 19, line 56 - column 20, line 31; figures 6,14 * [A] 1,10,12,18; | [X]US5402399 (OSHIBA MITSUO [JP], et al) [X] 21-24,26-30 * column 10, line 54 - column 13, line 6 * * column 17, line 14 - line 39 * * column 19, line 64 - column 20, line 2 *; | [Y]EP0714096 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 25,31,32 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - line 42 *; | [A]US5600626 (YOKOGAWA FUMIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 4-8,14-16 * the whole document *; | [PDX]US5627805 (FINKELSTEIN JACOB [IL], et al) [PDX] 1-3,12,13 * abstract * * column 11, line 33 - column 12, line 58; figures 10-12; claims 1-13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860830), vol. 010, no. 254, Database accession no. (P - 492), & JP61080563 A 19860424 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |