blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969977

EP0969977 - SOLID PARTICLES COATED WITH MELAMINE RESIN AND THE USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING DECORATIVE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.01.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WITTMANN, Otto
Max-Beckmann-Strasse 13b
D-67227 Frankenthal / DE
02 / ETLING, Hans
Pommernstrasse 12
D-67125 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE
03 / DECHER, Jakob
Otto-Karch-Strasse 12
D-67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98912375.723.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01033
Priority number, dateDE199711061914.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710619
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9841409
Date:24.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969977
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:B44C5/04, C08G12/42, D21H27/26, D21H27/28, B32B27/04
[2000/02]
CPC:
B32B21/04 (EP,US); B32B38/08 (US); B44C5/0476 (EP);
C08K9/08 (EP); C09C1/3072 (EP); C09C1/407 (EP);
C09C3/10 (EP); D21H19/62 (EP); D21H27/28 (EP);
B32B2317/125 (US); C01P2006/10 (EP); C01P2006/82 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C08K9/08, C08L61/28 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:MIT MELAMINHARZ BESCHICHTETE FESTKÖRPERPARTIKEL UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DEKORATIVEN GEGENSTÄNDEN[2000/02]
English:SOLID PARTICLES COATED WITH MELAMINE RESIN AND THE USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING DECORATIVE OBJECTS[2000/02]
French:PARTICULES SOLIDES RECOUVERTES DE RESINE MELAMINE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR FABRIQUER DES OBJETS DECORATIFS[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase10.08.1999National basic fee paid 
10.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
23.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/11]
09.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[PX]DE19604907  (THE MEAD CORP.) [PX] 1,2,4,5,8-11 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 53 *;
 [X]WO9700172  (PERSTORP AB) [X] 1,2,4,8-11 * page 2, line 8 - page 4, line 14; examples 1-10 *;
 [DX]US5344704  (R. D. O'DELL ET AL) [DX] 1,2,4,8,10,14 * column 3, line 25 - column 8, line 51; examples I-VI *;
 [DX]DE19508797  (FA. DR. GRAUDENZ & PARTNER CONSULTATION GMBH) [DX] 1-3,10,11 * column 2, line 53 - column 6, line 48 *;
 [XA]US3928706  (H. GIBBONS) [X] 10,11 * column 2, line 1 - column 5, line 11; examples 1,2 * [A] 1,2,4,7-9;
 [X]EP0519242  (FORMICA CORPORATION) [X] 1 * page 3, line 55 - page 5, line 37 *;
 [X]US5141799  (M. MEHTA ET AL) [X] 11 * column 2, line 30 - column 6, line 45 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.