EP0966412 - CELLULAR THERMAL INSULATING MATERIAL BASED ON DIATOMACEOUS EARTH AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHWENK Dämmtechnik GmbH & Co KG Isotexstrasse 1 86899 Landsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states E. Schwenk Dämmtechnik GmbH & Co. KG Isotexstrasse 1 D-86899 Landsberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98912392.2 | 25.02.1998 | [1999/52] | WO1998EP01070 | Priority number, date | DE1997107700 | 26.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19707700 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9838139 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966412 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0966412 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/18 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
C04B28/18 (EP,US);
C04B2111/28 (EP,US);
C04B2201/20 (EP,US);
C04B2201/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/18, C04B14/08, C04B38/02, C04B40/024, C04B2103/65 (EP,US);
C04B28/18, C04B14/08, C04B38/02, C04B40/024, C04B41/4905 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1999/52] | Title | German: | ZELLIGER WÄRMEDÄMMSTOFF AUF BASIS VON KIESELGUR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/13] | English: | CELLULAR THERMAL INSULATING MATERIAL BASED ON DIATOMACEOUS EARTH AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [1999/52] | French: | MATERIAU D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE CELLULAIRE A BASE DE TERRE A DIATOMEES ET PROCEDE POUR SA PRODUCTION | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/52] | ZELLFÖRMIGES WÄRMEDÄMMUNGSMATERIAL AUF BASIS VON DIATOMENERDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEINER HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPS5945953 [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | JPS6177657 [ ] (TOYO DENKA KOGYO KK); | [A]EP0247346 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1,3-6,8,11 * page 1, line 3 - line 18 * * page 3, line 15 - line 27; example 1 *; | [X] - N.YAMASAKI, "Hydrothermal synthesis of autoclaved light weight calcium silicate board", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850729), vol. 103, no. 4, Database accession no. 23957b, XP000188557 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [ ] - REP. RES. LAB. HYDROTHERM. CHEM., KOCHI, JP, (1984), vol. 5, no. 4-8, pages 42 - 47 | [X] - K.TAMURA, "Lightweight calcium silicate molded thermal insulation", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860825), vol. 105, no. 8, Database accession no. 65411r, XP000188521 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - SWIDERSKI, MAREK ET AL, "Possibility for production of autoclaved insulating material based on high-silicate natural pozzolans and burnt lime", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19801020), vol. 93, no. 16, Database accession no. 154837, XP000189147 [X] 6,7 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19840723), vol. 101, no. 4, Database accession no. 27545x, XP000188741 [A] 1,5,6,8,9 * abstract * |