blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973815

EP0973815 - RADIATION-CURABLE BINDER COMPOSITIONS HAVING HIGH ELONGATION AT BREAK AND TOUGHNESS AFTER CURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/04]RADIATION-CURABLE BINDER COMPOSITIONS HAVING HIGH ELONGATION AND TOUGHNESS AFTER CURE
[2003/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KRONGAUZ, Vadim, Valerie
1031 Knollwood Road
Barlett, IL 60103 / US
02 / SULLIVAN, Michael, Gordon
Apartment 102 1072 Todd Farm Drive
Elgin, IL 60123 / US
03 / LAPIN, Stephen
7126 Joy Marie Lane
Waterford, WI 53185 / US
04 / MURPHY, Edward, Joseph
742 South Mitchell
Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98912821.008.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998NL00201
Priority number, dateUS19970043761P08.04.1997         Original published format: US 43761 P
US19970045707P06.05.1997         Original published format: US 45707 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9845344
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973815
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973815
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C08F290/06, C08F220/10, C08F2/46
[2000/04]
CPC:
C09D175/16 (EP,US); C08F290/06 (KR); C08F290/067 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US); C08G18/672 (EP,US); C09D4/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US); Y10T428/31645 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C09D4/06, C08F290/067 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/18]
Former [2000/04]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
TitleGerman:STRAHLUNGSHÄRTBARE BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HOHER BRUCHDEHNUNG UND ZÄHIGKEIT NACH HÄRTUNG[2000/04]
English:RADIATION-CURABLE BINDER COMPOSITIONS HAVING HIGH ELONGATION AT BREAK AND TOUGHNESS AFTER CURE[2003/19]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE LIANT DURCISSANT SOUS L'EFFET DE RAYONS ET DEMONTRANT APRES DURCISSEMENT UN FORT ALLONGEMENT ET UNE GRANDE TENACITE[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]RADIATION-CURABLE BINDER COMPOSITIONS HAVING HIGH ELONGATION AND TOUGHNESS AFTER CURE
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
17.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2003Fee for grant paid
22.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.10.2003
FR22.10.2003
IT22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
DE23.01.2004
GB08.04.2004
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]AT22.10.2003
FR22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
DE23.01.2004
GB08.04.2004
Former [2005/45]AT22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
DE23.01.2004
GB08.04.2004
Former [2004/44]AT22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
DE23.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE22.01.2004
Cited inInternational search[XD]US4849462  (BISHOP TIMOTHY E [US]) [XD] 1-23* column 3, lines 6-20; example 3; claim - *;
 [X]US5426166  (USIFER DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15,17,22,23 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.