EP1041878 - ANTIMICROBIAL CLEANING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland, California 94612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland California 94612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Boli 3005 Terrace View Avenue Antioch, CA 94509 / US | 02 /
OCHOMOGO, Maria 717 Westbrook Danville, CA 94506 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913091.9 | 24.03.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US05807 | Priority number, date | US19970833276 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: US 833276 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844791 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041878 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/10, A01N33/12 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C11D3/48 (EP,US);
A01N33/12 (EP,US);
C11D3/3746 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N33/12, A01N25/34, A01N25/24, A01N25/10, A01N25/04 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2000/41] | A01N25/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/41] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLES REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2000/41] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL CLEANING COMPOSITION | [2000/41] | French: | COMPOSITION NETTOYANTE ANTIBACTERIENNE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   04.01.2000 | 15.12.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   04.01.2000 | 15.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   04.01.2000 | 15.12.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   04.01.2000 | 15.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   04.01.2000 | 15.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.12.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   04.01.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2000 | 31.03.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4847089 (KRAMER DAVID N [US], et al); | [X]US5158766 (GREENWALD RICHARD B [US], et al) [X] 1-30 *the whole document* | International search | [Y]US2700683 (TESORO GIULIANA C, et al); | [Y]US3141821 (COMPEAU GERALD M); | [Y]US3954113 (BOHRER JAMES CALVIN, et al); | [Y]US5616781 (SAJIC BRANKO [US], et al) |