Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001519964 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9805845 | 25.03.1998 | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0975437 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2005 | B1 | EP0975437 | 09.05.2001 | A4 | EP0975437 | 02.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9805845 | 25.03.1998 | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69832056T | 13.07.2006 | T2 | DE69832056D1 | 01.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9805845 | 25.03.1998 | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1024199 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9805845 | 25.03.1998 | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100555076B | 24.02.2006 | B1 | KR20000076078 | 26.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9805845 | 25.03.1998 | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6100636 | 08.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US97441997 | 20.11.1997 | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9843747 | Global Dossier | 08.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5912056 | 15.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US82925197 | 31.03.1997 |