EP0975437 - BLACK MATRIX WITH CONDUCTIVE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Candescent Intellectual Property Services, Inc. 6320 San Ignacio Avenue San Jose, CA 95119 / US | [2001/46] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Candescent Technologies Corporation 6580 Via del Oro San Jose, CA 95119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRUMM, Paul, M. 671 Cree Drive San Jose, CA 95123 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98913107.3 | 25.03.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998US05845 | Priority number, date | US19970829251 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: US 829251 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843747 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975437 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975437 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/12, G03C5/00, G09G3/20, G09G3/30, C23C16/00, H01J29/08, H01J9/227 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H01J29/085 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133512 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0035 (EP,KR,US);
H01J9/2278 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2329/00 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | B05D5/12, G03C5/00, G09G3/20, G09G3/30, C23C16/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2000/05] | Title | German: | SCHWARZMATRIX MIT LEITFÄHIGER BESCHICHTUNG | [2000/05] | English: | BLACK MATRIX WITH CONDUCTIVE COATING | [2000/05] | French: | MATRICE NOIRE COMPORTANT UN REVETEMENT CONDUCTEUR | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.08.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | DE FR GB IE | Licencee: | Candescent Technologies Corporation 6320 San Ignacio Avenue San Jose, California 95119 / US | Date: | 11.09.2001 | ID: | 02 00/not-exclusive | For: | DE FR GB IE | Licencee: | U.S. FEDERAL GOVERNMENT - - / US | Date: | 28.03.2003 | [2005/43] |
Former [2003/35] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Candescent Technologies Corporation 6320 San Ignacio Avenue San Jose, California 95119 / US | ||
Date: | 11.09.2001 | ||
ID: | 02 00/not-exclusive | ||
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | U.S. FEERAL GOVERNMENT - - / US | ||
Date: | 28.03.2003 | ||
[2005/43] | |||
Former [2001/47] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Candescent Technologies Corporation 6320 San Ignacio Avenue San Jose, California 95119 / US | ||
Date: | 11.09.2001 | ||
[2003/35] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 27.03.2006 | [2007/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0635865 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 13 * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 40 *; | [A]EP0684627 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 8-20 *; | [X]US5508584 (TSAI CHUN-HUI [TW], et al) [X] 13 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9616429 (SILICON VIDEO CORP [US], et al) [A] 13 * claims 26-38 *; | [PA]WO9719460 (CANDESCENT TECH CORP [US]) [PA] 1* claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2190020 (GOLDSMITH JR THOMAS T); | [A]US2324505 (IAMS HARLEY A, et al); | [Y]US3661580 (MAYAUD EDITH ELLEN); | [A]US3884694 (GALLARO ANTHONY V, et al); | [A]US3884695 (GALLARO ANTHONY V, et al); | [Y]US3891440 (GALLARO ANTHONY V, et al); | [Y]US4150990 (STETZ JOHN W [US]); | [Y]US4288513 (KILICHOWSKI KURT B, et al); | [Y]US4556626 (SPEIGEL KENNETH [US]); | [Y]US4757231 (KATO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5213849 (MANER ASIM [CH]); | [Y]US5281450 (YANIV ZVI [US]) |