EP0973784 - PREPARATION OF TERTIARY PHOSPHINES VIA NICKEL-CATALYZED CROSS COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PCBU Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue Suite 1269 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states PCBU Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue Suite 1269 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states NSC Technologies LLC 601 East Kensington Mount Prospect, Illinois 60056 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION One Great Lakes Blvd. West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states NSC Technologies LLC 601 East Kensington Mount Prospect, Illinois 60056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANEMAN, Scott, A. 300 Apollo Court Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 02 /
AGER, David, J. 1330 Newcastle Lane Hoffman Estate, IL 60194 / US | 03 /
EISENSTADT, Amihia Sold Street 9 47225 Ramat-Hasharon / IL | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/04] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Langner Parry, 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913165.1 | 26.03.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US06003 | Priority number, date | US19970824309 | 26.03.1997 Original published format: US 824309 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842716 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973784 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973784 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/50 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C07F9/5068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Extension states | AL | 26.10.1999 | LT | 26.10.1999 | LV | 26.10.1999 | RO | 26.10.1999 | SI | 26.10.1999 | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON TERTIÄR PHOPHINEN DURCH NICKEL-KATALYSIERTE CROSS COUPLING | [2000/04] | English: | PREPARATION OF TERTIARY PHOSPHINES VIA NICKEL-CATALYZED CROSS COUPLING | [2000/04] | French: | PREPARATION DE PHOSPHINES TERTIAIRES PAR COUPLAGE CROISE CATALISEE PAR DU NICKEL | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2002 | FI | 16.01.2002 | GR | 16.01.2002 | IE | 26.03.2002 | LU | 26.03.2002 | MC | 26.03.2002 | DK | 16.04.2002 | PT | 16.04.2002 | SE | 16.04.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
GR | 16.01.2002 | ||
IE | 26.03.2002 | ||
MC | 26.03.2002 | ||
DK | 16.04.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
GR | 16.01.2002 | ||
IE | 26.03.2002 | ||
MC | 26.03.2002 | ||
DK | 16.04.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
GR | 16.01.2002 | ||
IE | 26.03.2002 | ||
MC | 26.03.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
GR | 16.01.2002 | ||
IE | 26.03.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
IE | 26.03.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 16.01.2002 | |
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 16.01.2002 | |
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 16.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0268526 (POUDRES & EXPLOSIFS STE NALE [FR]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5399771 (CAI DONGWEI [US], et al) [DY] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0732336 (CYTEC CANADA INC [CA]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [DY] - TUNNEY S E ET AL, "PALLADIUM-CATALYZED COUPLING OF ARYL HALIDES WITH (TRIMETHYLSTANNYL)DIPHENYLPHOSPHINE AND (TRIMETHYLSILYL)DIPHENYLPHOSHINE", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19870101), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 748 - 753, XP002006947 [DY] 1-18 * the whole document * | [PX] - AGER D J ET AL, "Convenient and direct preparation of tertiary phosphines via nickel-catalyzed cross-coupling", CHEM. COMMUN. (CAMBRIDGE) (CHCOFS,13597345);(24); PP.2359-2360, A UNIT OF MONSANTO COMPANY;, NSC TECHNOLOGIES;MT. PROSPECT; 60056; IL; USA (US), XP002066497 [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a705106i |