blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973665

EP0973665 - AUTOMATIC VALVE DRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
[2003/36]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HENDERSHOT, Gary
248 Cornell Avenue
Amherst, OH 44001 / US
02 / JOHNSON, Duane, R.
41299 Jones Road
Wellington, OH 44090 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Weber, Dieter, et al
Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45
65051 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al
Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45
65051 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98913249.330.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06166
Priority number, dateUS1997082775411.04.1997         Original published format: US 827754
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846464
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973665
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B60T17/00, B60T15/18
[2000/04]
CPC:
B60T17/004 (EP,US); B60T15/18 (EP,US); Y10T137/3105 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86919 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE ENTWÄSSERUNG FÜR VENTILE[2000/04]
English:AUTOMATIC VALVE DRAIN[2000/04]
French:PURGE DE VALVE AUTOMATIQUE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
27.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/46]
13.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2000
31.03.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4146275  (ELLIOTT ROBERT H, et al) [A] 1,4,9 * column A; figures 3,5,8,12 *;
 [A]US5190359  (EGERTON GARY W [US]) [A] 1,4,9 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 21; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19533990  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,4,9* column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 45; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.