EP0977507 - ABSORBENT FOLDED HAND TOWEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCONNELL, Wesley, James 9040 Brockham Way Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913257.6 | 27.03.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998US06174 | Priority number, date | US19970847990 | 21.04.1997 Original published format: US 847990 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847419 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977507 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977507 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/16 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
A47K10/16 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDES GEFALTETES HANDTUCH | [2000/06] | English: | ABSORBENT FOLDED HAND TOWEL | [2000/06] | French: | ESSUIE-MAINS PLIE ABSORBANT | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Request for further processing for: | 04.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2238005 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO); | [A]US4755421 (MANNING JAMES H [US], et al); | [AD]US5048589 (COOK RONALD F [US], et al); | [AD]US5137600 (BARNES HAROLD K [US], et al) | by applicant | US5048589 | US5137600 |