blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973894

EP0973894 - CANCEROUS CELL DETECTION BY ANALYSIS OF RENAL NUCLEAR MATRIX PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/04]RENAL NUCLEAR MATRIX PROTEINS, POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES ENCODING THEM, AND THEIR USE
[2007/17]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
911 William Pitt Union
Pittsburgh
Pennsylvania 15260 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
911 William Pitt Union
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15260 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GETZENBERG, Robert, H.
1627 Augusta Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15237-6702 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/04]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913313.701.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06275
Priority number, dateUS19970041860P08.04.1997         Original published format: US 41860 P
[2000/40]
Former [2000/04]US19970004186P08.04.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9845432
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973894
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/12, C12N15/11, C12N15/85, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K39/395, A61K48/00, G01N33/574, G01N33/68
[2000/04]
CPC:
C07K14/7158 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US); A61K48/00 (EP,US); Y10S436/813 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:ERKENNUNG VON KREBSZELLEN DURCH ANALYSE VON RENALEN ZELLKERNMATRIXPROTEINEN[2007/17]
English:CANCEROUS CELL DETECTION BY ANALYSIS OF RENAL NUCLEAR MATRIX PROTEINS[2007/17]
French:RECOGNITION DES CELLULES CANCEREUSES PAR ANALYSE DES PROTEINS DANS LE MATRICE NUCLEAIRE DU REIN[2007/17]
Former [2000/04]ZELLKERNMATRIXPROTEINE, DAFÜR KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDSEQUENZEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG
Former [2000/04]RENAL NUCLEAR MATRIX PROTEINS, POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES ENCODING THEM, AND THEIR USE
Former [2000/04]PROTEINES DE MATRICE NUCLEAIRE DU REIN, SEQUENCES DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT ET LEUR UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
04.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
22.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/52]
10.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/52]
Request for further processing for:02.07.2003Request for further processing filed
02.07.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.07.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2002
30.04.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO8703910  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [AD] 1,3-47 * see esp. pp.8-10, p.17 l.23-p.20 *;
 [A]WO9309437  (MATRITECH INC [US]) [A] 1,3-47 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9400573  (MATRITECH INC [US]) [X] 16,22-33 * see esp. p.12 l.11-p.14 l.27, pp.25-48 *;
 [XD]WO9418222  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]) [XD] 1,3-47 * see the whole document, esp. p.47 l.23-25 *;
 [A]WO9516919  (MATRITECH INC [US]) [A] 1,3-47 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - EBERHARTER A. ET AL., "Nuclear matrix of the lower eukaryote Physarum polycephalum and the mammalian epithelial LLC-PK1 cell line", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (199303), vol. 212, no. 2, pages 573 - 580, XP002068893 [A] 1,3-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1993.tb17695.x
 [A]  - GETZENBERG R. ET AL., "Bladder cancer-associated nuclear matrix proteins", CANCER RESEARCH, (19960401), vol. 56, no. 7, pages 1690 - 1694, XP002068894 [A] 1,3-47 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KEESEE S. ET AL., "Utilization of nuclear matrix proteinsfor cancer diagnosis", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN EUKARYOTIC GENE EXPRESSION, (1996), vol. 6, no. 2/3, pages 189 - 214, XP002069158 [A] 1,3-47 * see pp. 194-206 *
 [PX]  - KONETY B. ET AL., "Identification of nuclear matrix protein alterations associated with renal cell carcinoma", THE JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (199804), vol. 159, no. 4, pages 1359 - 1363, XP002068895 [PX] 1,3-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5347(01)63616-4
 [PX]  - POUND C R ET AL, "Differential nuclear matrix protein ( NMP ) patterns in normal renal tissues and renal cell carcinoma ( RCC ).", 92ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA, APRIL 12-17, 1997. JOURNAL OF UROLOGY 157 (4 SUPPL.). 1997. 279. ISSN: 0022-5347, XP002076374 [PX] 1-47 * abstract *
 [PX]  - KONETY B R ET AL, "Characteristic nuclear matrix protein alterations in renal cell carcinoma ( RCC ).", 92ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA, APRIL 12-17, 1997. JOURNAL OF UROLOGY 157 (4 SUPPL.). 1997. 276. ISSN: 0022-5347, XP002076375 [PX] 1-47 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.