EP0967985 - PROCESS FOR IMPROVING GLUCOSE METABOLISM, SATIETY, AND NUTRIENT ABSORPTION IN COMPANION ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Revocation of patent | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE IAMS COMPANY 7250 Poe Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states THE IAMS COMPANY 7250 Poe Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNVOLD, Gregory, D. 651 Snedsted Drive Eaton, OH 45320-2629 / US | 02 /
HAYEK, Michael, G. 926 Tammy Circle Dayton, OH 45415-2136 / US | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2003/49] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2000/01] | Caldwell, Judith Margaret, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913414.3 | 06.04.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998US06893 | Priority number, date | US19970042957P | 07.04.1997 Original published format: US 42957 P | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844932 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967985 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967985 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/715, A61K45/06, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A61P3/08 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A23K20/163 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | A61K31/715, A61K45/06, A23K1/16, A23K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES GLUKOSEMETABOLISMUS, SÄTTIGUNGSGEFÜHLES, UND NÄHRSTOFFABSORPTION IN HAUSTIEREN | [2000/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR IMPROVING GLUCOSE METABOLISM, SATIETY, AND NUTRIENT ABSORPTION IN COMPANION ANIMALS | [2000/01] | French: | PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LE METABOLISME DU GLUCOSE, LA SATIETE ET L'ABSORPTION DES NUTRIMENTS CHEZ LES ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE NESTEC S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian, et al, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE NESTEC S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian, et al, et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | 24.04.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.11.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.12.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.12.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.12.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 19.12.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/23] | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 23.02.2010 | Appeal received No. T0432/10 | 28.04.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.12.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 17.03.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | CY | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | IT | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | PT | 23.11.2005 | IE | 06.04.2006 | LU | 06.04.2006 | ES | 30.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | NL | 01.11.2006 | [2009/30] |
Former [2009/02] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CY | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.04.2006 | ||
LU | 06.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
NL | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.04.2006 | ||
LU | 06.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
NL | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
NL | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
NL | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DY]US5616569 (REINHART GREGORY A [US]) [DY] 2-6,8-12 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 20 * * examples 4-6 * * claims 1-16 *; | [XY] - R.W. NELSON ET AL., "Effects of dietary fiber supplementation on glycemic control in dogs with alloxan-induced diabetes mellitus", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, US, (1991), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 2060 - 2066, XP002072419 [X] 1,7,13 * see page 2060, Summary; page 2061, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 2063, column 2, paragraph L - page 2065, column 1, paragraph L * [Y] 2-6,8-12 | [X] - R.V. SHARMA ET AL., "Effect of pectin on carbohydrate and fat metabolism", INDIAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL RESEARCH, INDIA, (1982), vol. 76, pages 771-771 - 775, XP002072420 [X] 1,7,13 * see page 771, Summary; page 772, column 2, paragraph L - page 774, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [PX] - M. DIEZ ET AL., "Influence of a blend of fructo-oligosaccharides and sugar beet fiber on nutrient digestibility and plasma metabolite concentrations in healthy Beagles", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, US, (1997), vol. 58, no. 11, pages 1238 - 1242, XP002072352 [PX] 1-8,13,15 * page 1238, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1239, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1239, column 2; table 1 * * page 1240, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1241, column 2, paragraph L * | [X] - S.P. MASSIMINO ET AL., "Fermentable dietary fiber improves glucose tolerance but not immune function in dogs", FASEB JOURNAL., FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY,, BETHESDA, MD US, (1997), vol. 11, no. 3, page A650, XP002072421 [X] 14 * see column 2, Abstract 3750 * | [X] - R.A. REIMER ET AL., "Dietary fiber modulates intestinal proglucagon messenger ribonucleic acid and postprandial secretion of glucagon-like peptide-1 and insulin in rats", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1996), vol. 137, no. 9, pages 3948 - 3956, XP002072422 [X] 14 * see page 3948, Abstract; page 3949, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 3950, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3954, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 3955, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.137.9.3948 | [X] - H.E. MUIR ET AL., "Nutrient digestion by ileal cannulated dogs as affected by dietary fibers with various fermentation characteristics", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, US, (1996), vol. 74, no. 7, pages 1641 - 1648, XP002072423 [X] 15 * see page 1641, Abstract; page 1641, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 1642, column 1; table 1 * * page 1644, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1648, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [X] - C. STOCK-DAMGE ET AL., "Effect of dietary fiber supplementation on the secretory function of the exocrine pancreas in the dog", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, US, (1983), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 843 - 848, XP002072424 [X] 16 * see page 843, Abstract; page 845, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 847, column 1, paragraph L * | [X] - WILLARD M D ET AL, "EFFECTS OF DIETARY SUPPLEMENTATION OF FRUCTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDES ON SMALL INTESTINAL BACTERIAL OVERGROWTH IN DOGS", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, (199405), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 654 - 659, XP000645762 [X] 16 * page 654, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 655, column 2; table 1 * * page 657, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 658, column 2, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | - SUNVOLD ET AL., J. ANIM. SCI., (1995), vol. 73, pages 1099 - 1109 |