blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971754

EP0971754 - LIPOSUCTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Malak, Jean Clément Edouard Ghislain
2, rue de Versailles
B-7130 Binche / BE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Quintelier, Claude, et al
Gevers
Intellectual Property House
Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Quintelier, Claude, et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7
1060 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date98913459.802.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998BE00047
Priority number, dateBE1997000030503.04.1997         Original published format: BE 9700305
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9844966
Date:15.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971754
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971754
Date:27.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61M1/00
[2000/03]
CPC:
A61M1/84 (EP,US); A61M1/89 (EP,US); A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B2017/32007 (EP,US); A61M2202/08 (EP,US); A61M2205/106 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A61M2202/08, A61M2202/0014 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesAL11.10.1999
LT11.10.1999
LV11.10.1999
MK11.10.1999
RO11.10.1999
SI11.10.1999
TitleGerman:FETTSAUGVORRICHTUNG[2000/03]
English:LIPOSUCTION APPARATUS[2000/03]
French:APPAREIL DE LIPO-ASPIRATION[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase11.10.1999National basic fee paid 
11.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
19.07.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
23.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
24.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.04.2001Fee for grant paid
23.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)28.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.06.2001
FI27.06.2001
IE27.06.2001
DK27.09.2001
PT27.09.2001
GR28.09.2001
[2005/01]
Former [2003/46]AT27.06.2001
FI27.06.2001
IE27.06.2001
DK27.09.2001
PT27.09.2001
Former [2002/48]AT27.06.2001
FI27.06.2001
IE27.06.2001
PT27.09.2001
Former [2002/25]AT27.06.2001
FI27.06.2001
PT27.09.2001
Former [2002/15]AT27.06.2001
FI27.06.2001
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE3313325  (KORTH KNUT DR) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 10 * * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 6 * [Y] 7,8;
 [Y]FR2559066  (MEDICALEX [FR]) [Y] 9 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 14 *;
 [A]US4863439  (SANDERSON TERRY L [US]);
 [A]FR2648050  (BOUVIER PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 15 *;
 [A]WO9302627  (MENTOR O & O INC [US]) [A] 6 * abstract * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 6 *;
 [XDY]FR2691624  (MEDICAMAT PROMOTION DIFFUSION [FR]) [XD] 1,3 * abstract * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 25 * [Y] 4-6,9;
 [YDA]US5348535  (CUCIN ROBERT L [US]) [YD] 4-6 * abstract * * column 6, line 55 - line 66 * * column 7, line 19 - line 37 * * column 20, line 18 - line 50 * [A] 1;
 [YDA]US5352194  (GRECO RICHARD J [US], et al) [YD] 7,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 23 * [A] 1,2
ExaminationUS4735604
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.