EP0968234 - SUPPORTED CATALYST SYSTEM FOR POLYMERIZING ALK-1-ENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISTEN, Marc, Oliver Römerweg 15 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, David Am Petzenberg 2 D-67725 Breunigweiler / DE | [2000/01] | Application number, filing date | 98913560.3 | 18.02.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998EP00929 | Priority number, date | DE1997109866 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19709866 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9840418 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968234 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968234 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/645 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/6192 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/61912 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/61916 (US,EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/17 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | GETRÄGERTES KATALYSATORSYSTEM ZUR POLYMERISATION VON ALK-1-ENEN | [2000/01] | English: | SUPPORTED CATALYST SYSTEM FOR POLYMERIZING ALK-1-ENES | [2000/01] | French: | SYSTEME CATALYSEUR SUPPORTE DESTINE A LA POLYMERISATION D'ALK-1-ENES | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 19.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2005 | 07.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | ES | 21.08.2006 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/21] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 10.08.2006 | |
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [D]US5001244 (WELBORN JR HOWARD C [US]); | [A]WO9201005 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-7,9-17 * siehe Ansprüche; Seite 17, Zeile 28 bis Seite 19, Zeile 17 *; | [DA]WO9316116 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-17 * siehe Ansprüche *; | [X]EP0630900 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [X] 1-6,8-17 * siehe Ansprüche und Seite 5, Zeilen 45-49 *; | [DX]EP0683179 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [DX] 1-17 * siehe Ansprüche; Seite 4, Zeilen 13-35; Seite 5, Zeilen 45-48; Seite 5, Zeile 54 bis Seite 6, Zeile 9 *; | [D]US5480848 (GEERTS ROLF L [US]); | [X]US5534473 (WELCH M BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * siehe Ansprüche; Spalte 8, Zeilen 10-34; Spalte 8, Zeilen 45-51; Spalte 6, Zeilen 49-59 * |