blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977591

EP0977591 - COSTIMULATION OF T-CELL PROLIFERATION BY A CHIMERIC BISPECIFIC PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/06]COSTIMULATION OF T-CELL PROLIFERATION BY A CHIMERIC BISPECIFIC COSTIMULATORY PROTEIN
[2003/49]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wels, Winfried
Bonner Weg 7
63110 Rodgau / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / WELS, Winfried
Glimpenheimer Strasse 55
D-79312 Emmendingen / DE
02 / GERSTMAYER, Bernhard
Am Heiligenhäuschen 15
D-50859 Köln / DE
[2000/11]
Former [2000/06]01 / WELS, Winfried
Glimpenheimer Strasse 55
D-79312 Emmendingen / DE
02 / GERSTMAYER, Bernhard
Pflegerweg 2
D-79115 Freiburg / DE
Representative(s)Keller, Günter
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Keller, Günter, Dr.
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913573.621.02.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998EP01009
Priority number, dateEP1997010349704.03.1997         Original published format: EP 97103497
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9839033
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977591
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/395
[2000/06]
CPC:
A61K39/395 (EP,US); A61P31/04 (EP); A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P37/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:KOSTIMULIERUNG VON T-ZELL PROLIFERATION MIT EINEM CHIMEREN BISPEZIFISCHEN PROTEIN[2003/49]
English:COSTIMULATION OF T-CELL PROLIFERATION BY A CHIMERIC BISPECIFIC PROTEIN[2003/49]
French:CO-STIMULATION DE LA PROLIFERATION DES LYMPHOCYTES T PAR UNE PROTEINE BISPECIFIQUE CHIMERE[2003/49]
Former [2000/06]COSTIMULIERUNG VON T-ZELL PROLIFERATION MIT EINEM CHIMEREM BISPEZIFISCHEM COSTIMULIERENDEM PROTEIN
Former [2000/06]COSTIMULATION OF T-CELL PROLIFERATION BY A CHIMERIC BISPECIFIC COSTIMULATORY PROTEIN
Former [2000/06]CO-STIMULATION DE LA PROLIFERATION DES LYMPHOCYTES T PAR UNE PROTEINE DE CO-STIMULATION BISPECIFIQUE CHIMERE
Entry into regional phase19.08.1999National basic fee paid 
19.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
30.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/40]
27.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]  - LUIS ALVAREZ-VALLINA ET AL., "ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC TARGETING OF CD28-MEDIATED T CELL CO-STIMULATION USING CHIMERIC SINGLE-CHAIN ANTIBODY VARIABLE FRAGMENT-CD28 RECEPTORS", EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (199610), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 2304 - 2309, XP002037712 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830261006
 [A]  - STEVEN M. CHAMOW ET AL., "IMMUNOADHESINS:PRINCIPLES AND APPLICATIONS", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, CAMBRIDGE GB, (199602), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 52 - 60, XP002037713

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(96)80921-8
 [A]  - MARK DE BOER ET AL., "GENERATION OF SCFV IMMUNOTOXIN MOLECULES BASED ON ANTI-B7.1/2 MABS FOR THE TREATMENT OF HODGKIN'S DISEASE", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, (199611), vol. 2, no. 4, page 298, XP002037714
 [A]  - JOHN DE KRUIF ET AL., "LEUCINE ZIPPER DIMERIZED BIVALENT AND BISPECIFIC SCFV ANTIBODIES FROM A PHAGE DISPLAY LIBRARY.(ABST. 308)", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, (199611), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 298 - 299, XP002037715
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.