EP0972202 - PROCESS FOR DIAGNOSING TRANSMISSIBLE SPONGIFORM ENCEPHALOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto, Markus Lange-Geismar-Strasse 3 37073 Göttingen / DE | For all designated states Wiltfang, Jens Südekumweg 12 37120 Bovenden-Eddigehausen / DE | For all designated states Schütz, Ekkehard Beekweg 23 37079 Göttingen / DE | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Hüppe, Paul Wilhelm REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Hüppe, Paul Wilhelm, Dipl.-Phys. Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98913583.5 | 24.02.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998EP01041 | Priority number, date | DE1997107230 | 24.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19707230 | [2000/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837420 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972202 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/543 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP);
G01N2333/4727 (EP);
G01N2800/2828 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN EINER ERKRANKUNG EINES ORGANISMUS AN EINER TRANSMISSIBLEN SPONGIFORMEN ENZEPHALOPATHIE | [2000/03] | English: | PROCESS FOR DIAGNOSING TRANSMISSIBLE SPONGIFORM ENCEPHALOPATHY | [2000/03] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER L'ENCEPHALOPATHIE SPONGIFORME TRANSMISSIBLE | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/13] | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/13] | Request for further processing for: | 30.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US4654313 (HARTMAN BOYD K) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4892814 (HARRINGTON MICHAEL G ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [PX] - S POSER, I ZERR, W J SCHULZ-SCHAEFFER, H A KRETZSCHMAR, K FELGENHAUER, "Die Creutzfeldt-Jakob-Krankheit. Eine Sphinx der heutigen Neurobiologie", DEUTSCHE MEDIZINISCHE WOCHENSCHRIFT, (19970912), vol. 122, no. 37, pages 1099 - 1105, XP002071129 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * | [PX] - M OTTO, H STEIN, A SZUDRA, I ZERR, M BODEMER, O GEFELLER, S POSER, H A KRETZSCHMAR, M MÄDER, T WEBER, "S-100 protein concentration in the cerebrospinal fluid of patients with Creutzfeldt-Jakob disease", JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY (ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR NEUROLOGIE), (199709), vol. 244, no. 9, pages 566 - 570, XP002071130 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004150050145 | [PX] - M OTTO, J WILTFANG, E SCHÜTZ, I ZERR, A OTTO, A PFAHLBERG, O GEFELLER, M UHR, A GIESE, T WEBER, H A KRETZSCHMAR, S POSER, "Diagnosis of Creutzfeldt-Jakob disease by measurement of S100 protein in serum: prospective case-control study", BMJ (CLINICAL RESEARCH ED,), (19980221), vol. 316, no. 7131, pages 577 - 582, XP002071131 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * | [DY] - T JIMI, Y WAKAYAMA, S SHIBUYA, H NAKATA, T TOMARU, Y TAKAHASHI, K KOSAKA, T ASANO, K KATO, "High levels of nervous system-specific proteins in cerebrospinal fluid in patients with early stage Creutzfeldt-Jakob disease", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, (19921015), vol. 211, no. 1-2, pages 37 - 46, XP002071132 [DY] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(92)90103-W | [Y] - K KATO, F SUZUKI, N KUROBE, K OKAJIMA, N OGASAWARA, M NAGAYA, T YAMANAKA, "Enhancement of S-100-beta Protein in Blood of Patients with Down's syndrome", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR NEUROSCIENCE, (1990), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 109 - 113, XP002071133 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | [Y] - O C FAGNART, C J M SINDIC, C LATERRE, "Particle Counting Immunoassay of S100 Protein in Serum. Possible Relevance in Tumors and Ischemic Disorders of the Central Nervous System", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 34, no. 7, pages 1387 - 1391, XP002071134 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * |