EP0968370 - DOSING PUMP FOR DOSED LIQUID CONVEYANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lang Apparatebau GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 7 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH Raiffeisenstrasse 7 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNKLINGER, Herbert Guggelberg 2 D-83324 Ruhpolding / DE | 02 /
RUTZ, Klaus Spielwanger Strasse 36 D-83377 Vachendorf / DE | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Wacker, Manfred Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Wacker, Manfred, Dr. Henkel KGaA, Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98913716.1 | 13.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998EP01458 | Priority number, date | DE1997112096 | 22.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19712096 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842983 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968370 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968370 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04B53/06 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
F04B53/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | DOSIERPUMPE ZUM DOSIERTEN FÖRDERN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2000/01] | English: | DOSING PUMP FOR DOSED LIQUID CONVEYANCE | [2000/01] | French: | POMPE DE DOSAGE POUR REFOULER DES LIQUIDES DE MANIERE DOSEE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 19.12.2001 | GR | 19.12.2001 | IE | 19.12.2001 | AT | 13.03.2002 | DK | 19.03.2002 | PT | 19.03.2002 | SE | 19.03.2002 | BE | 31.03.2002 | CH | 31.03.2002 | LI | 31.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/04] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
AT | 13.03.2002 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
AT | 13.03.2002 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/47] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
AT | 13.03.2002 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH457146 (GLUTZ BLOTZHEIM NACHFOLGER AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2177183 (MPL PUMPS LIMITED) [A] 1* page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 72; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4951701 (BOEHMER DENNIS A [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]DE4219663 (PROMINENT DOSIERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE4241030 (LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 32; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE4241030 | DE4219663 |