blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973852

EP0973852 - COMPLEX ESTERS FOR USE WITH FLUORINATED REFRIGERANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.05.2006  [2006/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neste Chemicals Oy
Keilaniemi
02150 Espoo / FI
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / ANKNER, Kjell
Radavägen 23
S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE
02 / GLAD, Essi
Humaltarhantie 1 C 21
FIN-06450 Porvoo / FI
03 / AALTO, Mikko
Kannuskuja 7 C 26
FIN-01200 Vantaa / FI
04 / SARANPÄÄ, Virpi
Punavuorenkatu 9 A 10
FIN-00120 Helsinki / FI
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Sundman, Patrik Christoffer, et al
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Sundman, Christoffer, et al
Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98913779.908.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998FI00312
Priority number, dateFI1997000154811.04.1997         Original published format: FI 971548
[2000/04]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846705
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973852
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C10M105/42
[2000/04]
CPC:
C10M105/32 (EP); C09K5/045 (EP); C10M105/38 (EP);
C10M105/42 (EP); C10M105/44 (EP); C10M171/008 (EP);
C10M2207/2805 (EP); C10M2207/281 (EP); C10M2207/282 (EP);
C10M2207/283 (EP); C10M2207/2835 (EP); C10M2207/286 (EP);
C10M2207/289 (EP); C10M2207/30 (EP); C10M2207/302 (EP);
C10M2207/3025 (EP); C10M2207/345 (EP); C10M2211/022 (EP);
C10M2211/06 (EP); C10N2040/00 (EP); C10N2040/02 (EP);
C10N2040/30 (EP); C10N2040/32 (EP); C10N2040/34 (EP);
C10N2040/36 (EP); C10N2040/38 (EP); C10N2040/40 (EP);
C10N2040/42 (EP); C10N2040/44 (EP); C10N2040/50 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesLT08.10.1999
LV08.10.1999
TitleGerman:KOMPLEXE ESTER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN KÜHLSCHMIERSTOFFEN[2000/04]
English:COMPLEX ESTERS FOR USE WITH FLUORINATED REFRIGERANTS[2000/04]
French:ESTERS COMPLEXES CON US POUR ETRE UTILISES AVEC DES REFRIGERANTS FLUORES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase08.10.1999Translation filed 
08.10.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
27.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/19]
05.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/19]
Request for further processing for:23.12.2004Request for further processing filed
23.12.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.01.2005Decision despatched
26.06.2003Request for further processing filed
26.06.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.07.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JP06041559  ;
 [X]EP0415778  (KAO CORP [JP]);
 [X]EP0435253  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]WO9324587  (HENKEL CORP [US]);
 [X]WO9513333  (HENKEL CORP [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.