blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973524

EP0973524 - COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL USE OF 7-HYDROXYLATED STEROIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vitasterol S.A.R.L.
4, rue Guynemer
75006 Paris / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / DRAY, Fernand, Joseph
4, rue Guynemer
F-75006 Paris / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Goulard, Sophie, et al
Cabinet ORES 36 Rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Goulard, Sophie, et al
Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris Cedex / FR
Former [2000/04]Mouget-Goniot, Claire
Cabinet Orès, 6, Avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98913857.306.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998FR00457
Priority number, dateFR1997000281110.03.1997         Original published format: FR 9702811
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9840074
Date:17.09.1998
Language:FR
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973524
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973524
Date:28.08.2002
Language:FR
[2002/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/565, A61K31/57, A61K7/48, A61P17/04
[2001/51]
CPC:
A61K31/5685 (EP,US); A61K8/63 (EP,US); A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP); A61Q19/00 (EP,US); A61Q19/08 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/04]A61K31/565, A61K31/57, A61K7/48
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE VERWENDUNG VON 7-HYDROXYLIERTEN STEROIDEN[2000/04]
English:COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL USE OF 7-HYDROXYLATED STEROIDS[2000/04]
French:UTILISATION COSMETIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE DE STEROIDES 7-HYDROXYLES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
20.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2002Fee for grant paid
07.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0189738  (ORENTREICH NORMAN) [X] 7 * abstract * * page 6, line 4 - line 13 * * page 18; table 1 * * claims 1,10,12,18 *;
 [Y]EP0415766  (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8-11 * page 2, line 14 - line 53 *;
 [DY]WO9408588  (CONSERVATOIRE NAT ARTS [FR], et al) [DY] 1-3,5,6,8-11 * page 8, line 17 - line 28 * * page 18, line 16 - page 19, line 29 * * example IV * * page 23, line 18 - page 25 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9510283  (BROADBENT J W NOMINEES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,2,8,10* page 6 - page 7 *;
 [A]EP0723775  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [D]FR2729854  (OREAL [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.