07.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
08.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
21.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
30.05.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
09.05.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
15.04.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
28.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
07.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
29.11.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
17.05.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
19.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.11.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.05.2000 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.11.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] |
19.11.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] |
01.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|