EP0968492 - DEVICE FOR DRIVING A LARGE DIMENSION FILM, IN PARTICULAR ADVERTISING POSTERS SUPPORTED BY AN UNWINDING STRIP, SCREEN AND ADVERTISING VEHICLE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soficom S.A.R.L. 23, rue Petite Biesse 44200 Nantes / FR | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARQUIN, Jean-Yves Soficom S.a.r.l., 23, rue Petite Biesse F-44200 Nantes / FR | 02 /
COUAPEL, Pascal Soficom S.a.r.l., 23, rue Petite Biesse F-44200 Nantes / FR | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Breesé, Pierre Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Breese, Pierre Breese - Majerowicz 3, avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98913858.1 | 06.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998FR00458 | Priority number, date | FR19970003498 | 21.03.1997 Original published format: FR 9703498 | [2000/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843228 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968492 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968492 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/29, G09F21/04 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
G09F11/29 (EP);
G09F21/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANTRIEB EINES GROSSFLÄHIGEN FILMS, INSBESONDERE VON WERBEPLAKATEN AUF EINEM ABSPULENDEN BAND, TAFEL UND EIN MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG AUSGESTATTETES WERBEFAHRZEUG | [2000/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR DRIVING A LARGE DIMENSION FILM, IN PARTICULAR ADVERTISING POSTERS SUPPORTED BY AN UNWINDING STRIP, SCREEN AND ADVERTISING VEHICLE COMPRISING SAME | [2000/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN FILM DE GRANDE DIMENSION, NOTAMMENT D'AFFICHES PUBLICITAIRES SUPPORTEES PAR UNE BANDE DEFILANTE, PANNEAU ET VEHICULE PUBLICITAIRE COMPORTANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 16.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.07.2002 | FI | 03.07.2002 | GB | 03.07.2002 | GR | 03.07.2002 | IE | 03.07.2002 | IT | 03.07.2002 | NL | 03.07.2002 | DK | 03.10.2002 | PT | 03.10.2002 | SE | 03.10.2002 | DE | 05.10.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | LU | 06.03.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2005/21] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
FI | 03.07.2002 | ||
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
LU | 06.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
LU | 06.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
LU | 06.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | GB | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GB | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GB | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 03.07.2002 | |
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.07.2002 | |
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 03.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2579810 (VRAIN BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1,3,7-9* abstract *; | [A]DE3639660 (ZANETTI FRANCO EPC SYSTEM [IT]) [A] 1-3,5-8 * column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 67; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0487791 (EVERBRITE INC [US]) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * column 5, line 47 - column 10, line 34; figures 6-8 *; | [A]WO9420945 (ABLE IND PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,3,5-8 * page 3, line 6 - page 5, line 11; figures 1-5 *; | [PXA]FR2743177 (LORELAN SARL [FR]) [PX] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * [PA] 3,5,7 |