EP0923323 - DISPENSER FOR CRUMBLY PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERET, Jean-Louis, H. 15, rue Hégésippe Moreau F-75018 Paris / FR | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [1999/25] | Boulard, Denis L'OREAL - DPI - 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98913876.3 | 10.03.1998 | [1999/25] | WO1998FR00479 | Priority number, date | FR19970002864 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: FR 9702864 | [1999/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9839991 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923323 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923323 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/04, A45D40/02 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
A45D40/04 (EP,US);
A45D40/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/25] | Title | German: | SPENDER FÜR STREICHFÄHIGE PRODUKTE | [1999/25] | English: | DISPENSER FOR CRUMBLY PRODUCT | [1999/25] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR POUR UN PRODUIT DELITABLE | [1999/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR692767 (JANVIER) [X] 1-6,14,17,18,24 * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 5; figure 2 *; | [DA]US2491723 (ALBERT GELARDIN); | [X]FR968384 (BIMECA SOC) [X] 1-6,10,11,14,17,24 * the whole document *; | [A]US2565346 (BRASELTON CHESTER H); | [A]US2704153 (IRVING FLORMAN) [A] 1,15 * column W *; | [X]FR1261214 (LEMELAND) [X] 1-6,8,9,16,17,24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0093815 (KOTOBUKI & CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3318892 (HINTERKOPF GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5102249 (HOLLOWAY THOMAS F [US], et al); | [A]WO9603899 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |