EP0904501 - TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AP TMF Limited Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states AP TMF Limited Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Alastair, John 39 Roundshill,Kenilworth Warwickshire CV8 1DW / GB | 02 /
FITZPATRICK-ELLIS, John, Francis 82 Montague Road,Warwick Warwickshire CV34 5LL / GB | 03 /
LAMBERT, Adam, Johnson 21 North Villiers Street,Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5XY / GB | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger, et al Automotive Products Group Ltd. Patent Department P.O. Box 2085 Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ZL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Morrall, Roger, et al Automotive Products plc Patent Department Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV32 3ZT / GB | ||
Former [1999/13] | Morrall, Roger Automotive Products plc Patent Department Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913935.7 | 27.03.1998 | [1999/13] | WO1998GB00941 | Priority number, date | GB19970006466 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9706466 | GB19980001329 | 23.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9801329 | GB19980003046 | 13.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9803046 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844276 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904501 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
F16F15/13171 (EP,US);
F16F15/1205 (EP,US);
F16F15/13164 (EP,US);
F16C2361/55 (EP,US);
F16C27/04 (EP,US);
F16H45/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/13] | Title | German: | TORSIONSSCHWINGSDÄMPFER | [1999/13] | English: | TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPERS | [1999/13] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS TORSIONNELLES | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.2000 | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US4611701 (FRIEDMANN OSWALD [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 11 - column 11, line 49; figure -; claim - * [A] 3-6,9 [Y] 15-19; | [DPXY]WO9730302 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC [GB], et al) [DPX] 28 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 15-19; | [A]EP0361669 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,26,27 * the whole document *; | [A]US5533815 (SCHIERLING BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE4307830 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4729464 (FRIEDMANN OSWALD [DE]) | by applicant | GB2229793 | GB2151332 | GB2296072 | WO9618832 | GB2220464 | GB19620097003 |