blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971834

EP0971834 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO HYDRAULIC BRAKING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
Stratford Road, Solihull
West Midlands B90 4LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
Stratford Road, Solihull
West Midlands B90 4LA / GB
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company
Stratford Road
Solihull, West Midlands B90 4LA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / UZZELL, Robert, George
21 Atcham Close, Winyates East
Redditch, Worcestershire B98 0NY / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Spall, Christopher John, et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Spall, Christopher John, et al
BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road
Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date98913949.801.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998GB00957
Priority number, dateGB1997000695505.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9706955
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9845151
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971834
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971834
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B60T13/68, B60T11/18
[2000/03]
CPC:
B60T8/4081 (EP); B60T11/18 (EP); B60T13/686 (EP);
B60T7/042 (EP); B60T8/88 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN IN BEZUG AUF HYDRAULISCHE BREMSANLAGEN[2000/03]
English:IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO HYDRAULIC BRAKING SYSTEMS[2000/03]
French:AMELIORATIONS DANS DES SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE HYDRAULIQUE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
22.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2002Fee for grant paid
14.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4425005  (WARWICK EDWARD H [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 3; figure 1 * [A] 2,15;
 [A]US5603217  (MAJERSIK LOREN E [US], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 43; figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.