10.06.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
18.06.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
26.05.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.05.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.11.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
28.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.09.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
07.08.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
12.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.05.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
04.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.02.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
19.09.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
19.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.04.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
17.12.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
11.12.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
06.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|