Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001518091 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU740247B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2001 | B2 | AU6848398 | 22.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0975665 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2004 | B1 | EP0975665 | 02.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE272649T | 15.08.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9808631 | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2284863 | 31.07.2007 | C | CA2284863 | 08.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69825433T | 15.09.2005 | T2 | DE69825433D1 | 09.09.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0975665T | 06.12.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP98913971 | 24.03.1998 | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU9700673D0 | 28.05.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL132095 | 10.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI0975665T | 28.02.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP98913971 | 24.03.1998 | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6372263 | 16.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | HU9800031 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9843996 | Global Dossier | 08.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1222538C | 12.10.2005 | C | CN1253566 | 17.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2226119T | 16.03.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU221407 | 28.09.2002 | B1 | HUP9701165 | 28.08.2000 | A3 | HUP9701165 | 29.03.1999 | A2 | HU9701165D0 | 29.09.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT975665E | 31.12.2004 | E | Priority number | Date | HUP9701165 | 09.05.1997 | HUP9700673 | 28.03.1997 |