blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972426

EP0972426 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR BASS ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
K.S. Waves Ltd.
Kalisher Street 23
65165 Tel Aviv / IL
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SHASHOUA, Meir
Fireberg Street 32
63827 Tel Aviv / IL
02 / GLOTTER, Daniel
Lilach Street 81
71908 Reut / IL
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Bohnenberger, Johannes
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr.
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914002.503.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998IL00164
Priority number, dateUS1997083281204.04.1997         Original published format: US 832812
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846044
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972426
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972426
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04R3/04
[2000/03]
CPC:
H04R3/04 (EP,KR,US); G10L21/038 (EP,US); H03G9/005 (EP,US);
H03G9/025 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERVORHEBUNG DER BASSFREQUENZ[2000/03]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR BASS ENHANCEMENT[2000/03]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RENFORCER LES BASSES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1999National basic fee paid 
08.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2002Fee for grant paid
11.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.01.2003
IT22.01.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]FR22.01.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/05]DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/04]ES30.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2315249  (DE ROSA LOUIS A) [AD] 1,15,16,30 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 2 *;
 [A]US4182930  (BLACKMER DAVID E [US]) [A] 1,15,16,30* column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 4 *;
 [AD]US4698842  (MACKIE GREGORY C [US], et al) [AD] 1,15,16,30 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 44 *;
 [AX]EP0546619  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,15,16 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 49 * [X] 30;
 [A]EP0729287  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,15,16,30 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.