EP0911504 - COMBINED CYCLE POWER GENERATING PLANT AND METHOD OF SUPPLYING COOLING STEAM FOR GAS TURBINE IN SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEMATSU, Kazuo, Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Hidetaka, Takasago Res. & Dev. Center Mitsubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome,Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | 03 /
SUGISHITA, Hideaki, Takasago Res.& Dev.Center Mitssubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome,Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | 04 /
HIROKAWA, Kazuharu, Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome,Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | [1999/34] |
Former [1999/17] | 01 /
UEMATSU, Kazuo, Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | ||
02 /
MORI, Hidetaka, Takasago Res. & Dev. Center Mitsubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome,Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | |||
03 /
SUGISHITA, Hideaki, Takasago Res.& Dev.Center Mitssubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome,Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | |||
04 /
HIROWAKA, Kazuharu, Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi H.I.Ltd, 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome,Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken 676-0008 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98914033.0 | 15.04.1998 | [1999/17] | WO1998JP01727 | Priority number, date | JP19970097284 | 15.04.1997 Original published format: JP 9728497 | JP19970097285 | 15.04.1997 Original published format: JP 9728597 | JP19970098933 | 16.04.1997 Original published format: JP 9893397 | JP19970136600 | 27.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13660097 | JP19970165914 | 23.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16591497 | [1999/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846872 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0911504 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911504 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/18, F02C7/18, F01K23/10 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
F02C7/18 (EP,US);
F01K23/10 (EP,US);
F01K23/106 (EP,US);
F02C6/18 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2322 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/17] | Title | German: | GAS- DAMPFKRAFTWERK UND VERFAHREN UM DIE GASTURBINE MIT KÜHLGAS ZU VERSEHEN | [1999/17] | English: | COMBINED CYCLE POWER GENERATING PLANT AND METHOD OF SUPPLYING COOLING STEAM FOR GAS TURBINE IN SAME | [1999/17] | French: | CENTRALE ELECTRIQUE A CYCLE COMBINE ET PROCEDE POUR AMENER DE LA VAPEUR DE REFROIDISSEMENT A LA TURBINE A GAZ DE LADITE CENTRALE | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1998 | Translation filed | 02.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 02.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04010095.0 / EP1441110 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.11.2005 | FR | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | GB | 15.04.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/15] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 15.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 15.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
LI | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH05163960 (TOHOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al); | [Y]JPH0693879 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH06323162 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH074210 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH07119413 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]EP0743425 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]JPH0988519 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [YE]JPH09256815 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XE]JPH1077806 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [YE]JPH10131719 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | JPH05163960 |