blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976825

EP0976825 - TRANSCRIPTIONAL REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Chugai Research Institute for Molecular Medicine Inc.
153-2, Nagai Niihari-mura
Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 300-4101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Michael H. Chugai Res.Inst.for MolecularMed
153-2, Nagai, Niihari-mura
Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 300-4101 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/05]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914082.717.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998JP01782
Priority number, dateJP1997011640218.04.1997         Original published format: JP 11640297
[2000/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9848015
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976825
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2002
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C12P21/02, C07K14/52, C07K14/82, C07K16/24, C07K16/32, C12Q1/02
[2000/05]
CPC:
C07K14/4702 (EP,US); G01N33/6872 (EP,US); G01N33/689 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US); G01N2333/4712 (EP,US); G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:TRANSKRIPTIONSREGULATOR[2000/05]
English:TRANSCRIPTIONAL REGULATOR[2000/05]
French:REGULATEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1999Translation filed 
12.11.1999National basic fee paid 
12.11.1999Search fee paid 
12.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
09.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/07]
28.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - EMBL, (19951014), URL: EMBL, XP002189601 [X] 10 * abstract *
 [X]  - NICOLAS R H ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING OF POLYBROMO, A NUCLEAR PROTEIN CONTAINING MULTIPLE DOMAINS INCLUDING FIVE BROMODOMAINS, A TRUNCATED HMG-BOX, AND TWO REPEATS OF A NOVEL DOMAIN", GENE, AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19961010), vol. 175, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 233 - 240, XP004043320 [X] 6,11 * page 238, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)82845-9
 [Y]  - BECK S ET AL, "A HOMOLOGUE OF THE DROSOPHILA FEMALE STERILE HOMEOTIC (FSH) GENE INTHE CLASS II REGION OF THE HUMAN MHC", DNA SEQUENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1992), vol. 2, ISSN 1042-5179, pages 203 - 210, XP002910982 [Y] 1-7,10-12 * abstract * * page 204, column 1 * * page 209, column 2 *
 [Y]  - HAYNES S R ET AL, "THE BROMODOMAIN: A CONSERVED SEQUENCE FOUND IN HUMAN, DROSOPHILA AND YEAST PROTEINS", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1992), vol. 20, no. 10, ISSN 0305-1048, page 2603, XP002916468 [Y] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document *
 [T]  - JONES ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BPFT, A NOVEL BROMODOMAIN TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR", GENOMICS, (2000), vol. 63, pages 35 - 39, XP002189600 [T] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1999.6070
International search[XP]  - JONES M. H., NUMATA M., SHIMANE M., "IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BRDT: A TESTIS-SPECIFIC GENERELATED TO THE BROMODOMAIN GENES RING3 AND DROSOPHILA FSH.", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO., US, US, (19971101), vol. 45., doi:10.1006/geno.1997.5000, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 529 - 534., XP002910981

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1997.5000
 [X]  - BECK S, ET AL., "A HOMOLOGUE OF THE DROSOPHILA FEMALE STERILE HOMEOTIC (FSH) GENE INTHE CLASS II REGION OF THE HUMAN MHC", DNA SEQUENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19920101), vol. 02, ISSN 1042-5179, pages 203 - 210, XP002910982
 [X]  - HAYNES S. R., ET AL., "THE DROSOPHILA FSH LOCUS, A MATERNAL EFFECT HOMEOTIC GENE, ENCODES APPARENT MEMBRANE PROTEINS.", Developmental Biology, Academic Press, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890101), vol. 134., doi:10.1016/0012-1606(89)90094-8, ISSN 0012-1606, pages 246 - 257., XP002910983

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0012-1606(89)90094-8
 [A]  - NOMURA N, ET AL., "PREDICTION OF THE CODING SEQUENCES OF UNIDENTIFIED HUMAN GENES. II.THE CODING SEQUENCES OF 40 NEW GENES (KIAA0041-KIAA0080) DEDUCED BYANALYSIS OF CDNA CLONES FROM HUMAN CELL LINE KG-1", DNA RESEARCH., UNIVERSAL ACADEMY PRESS., JP, JP, (19940101), doi:10.1093/dnares/1.5.223, ISSN 1340-2838, pages 223 - 229, XP002910984

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/1.5.223
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.