blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980629

EP0980629 - ARRANGEMENT FOR IMPROVING AVAILABILITY OF SERVICES IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / THANH, Do, Van
Stjernemyrveien 28
N-0673 Norway / NO
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia
Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2005/17]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Kista
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/01]Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al
Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/16]Wennerholm, Kristian, et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/08]Wennerholm, Kristian, et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98914157.702.04.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998NO00107
Priority number, dateNO1997000160508.04.1997         Original published format: NO 971605
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9845988
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980629
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04Q3/00, H04L12/16, G06F9/46
[2000/08]
CPC:
H04W8/18 (EP,US); H04L63/10 (EP,US); H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US); H04L67/303 (EP,US); H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US); H04L67/52 (EP,US); H04L9/40 (US);
H04Q3/005 (EP,US); H04Q3/0095 (EP,US); H04W12/084 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US); H04L69/03 (EP,US); H04L69/32 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US); H04W80/04 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/08]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VERFÜGBARKEIT VON DIENSTEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2000/08]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR IMPROVING AVAILABILITY OF SERVICES IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2000/08]
French:AGENCEMENT DESTINE A AMELIORER LA DISPONIBILITE DE SERVICES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
25.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/26]
08.05.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2008
08.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
12.06.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9625012  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al)
 [X]  - IEEE 46TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1996, (USA), VAN THANH et al., "Making Mobility Transparent to the Applications".
 [Y]  - TELETRONIKK, Volume 90, No. 2, 1994, (Norway), HANDEGARD T., "The TINA Consortium".
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.