blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972395

EP0972395 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE OPERATION OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / KOSTENIUS, Tomas
Löjtnant Granlunds väg 1B
S-281 52 Hässleholm / SE
02 / HÄLLGREN, Gunnar
Hagvägen 57 B
S-141 70 Huddinge / SE
03 / OMNELL, Hakan
Östra kyrkogatan 87
S-907 88 Umea / SE
04 / LUNDBERG, Richard
Blandsädesgatan 8B
SE-431 46 MÖLNDAL / SE
[2000/09]
Former [2000/03]01 / KOSTENIUS, Tomas
Löjtnant Granlunds väg 1B
S-281 52 Hässleholm / SE
02 / HÄLLGREN, Gunnar
Hagvägen 57 B
S-141 70 Huddinge / SE
03 / OMNELL, Hakan
Östra kyrkogatan 87
S-907 88 Umea / SE
04 / LUNDBERG, Richard
Snipgränd 140
S-906 24 Umea / SE
Representative(s)Sandström, Staffan Sven, et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Sandström, Staffan Sven, et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98914188.220.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998SE00513
Priority number, dateUS1997082893628.03.1997         Original published format: US 828936
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9844704
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972395
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04M3/36, H04M3/30, H04M3/22
[2000/03]
CPC:
H04M3/36 (EP,US); H04M3/22 (EP,US); H04M3/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR FUNKTIONSÜBERWACHUNG EINER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG[2003/17]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE OPERATION OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS EQUIPMENT[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER L'EXPLOITATION D'UN EQUIPEMENT DE TELECOMMUNICATION[2000/03]
Former [2000/03]VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR FUNKTIONSÜBERWCHUNG EINER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
04.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
07.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2000
31.03.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2743235  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-4,11,14,27 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2348612  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-4,11,14,27;
 [A]US4306295  (CAROC TORBEN E) [A] 1-4,11,14,27
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.