blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970362

EP0970362 - METHOD FOR SUPPRESSION OF MAGNETO-ACOUSTIC ARTIFACTS IN NMR DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/02]PULSE SEQUENCE AND METHOD FOR SUPPRESSION OF MAGNETO-ACOUSTIC ARTIFACTS IN NMR DATA
[2005/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, TX 75381-9052 / US
[2008/01]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
NUMAR CORPORATION
508 Lapp Road
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PRAMMER, Manfred, G.
291 Hadfield Road
Downingtown, PA 19335 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Curtis, Philip Anthony
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/32]Curtis, Philip Anthony
A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [2000/02]Moreland, David, Dr., et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date98914284.925.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05703
Priority number, dateUS1997082613226.03.1997         Original published format: US 826132
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843064
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970362
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970362
Date:28.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2002
ClassificationIPC:G01V3/32, G01R33/44, G01N3/00
[2002/27]
CPC:
G01R33/5617 (EP,US); G01N24/081 (EP,US); G01V3/32 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/02]G01N3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON MAGNETO-AKUSTISCHEN ARTEFAKTEN IN KERNRESONANZDATEN[2005/24]
English:METHOD FOR SUPPRESSION OF MAGNETO-ACOUSTIC ARTIFACTS IN NMR DATA[2005/24]
French:PROCEDE DE SUPPRESSION DES ARTEFACTS MAGNETO-ACOUSTIQUES DANS LES DONNEES DE RMN[2005/24]
Former [2000/02]Pulssequenz und Verfahren zur Unterdrückung von magneto-akustischen Artefaktenin Kernresonanzdaten
Former [2000/02]PULSE SEQUENCE AND METHOD FOR SUPPRESSION OF MAGNETO-ACOUSTIC ARTIFACTS IN NMR DATA
Former [2000/02]SEQUENCE D'IMPULSIONS ET PROCEDE DE SUPPRESSION DES ARTEFACTS MAGNETO-ACOUSTIQUES DANS LES DONNEES DE RMN
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Search fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
10.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
07.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
07.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2007Fee for grant paid
15.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07075850.3  / EP1898235
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Request for further processing for:07.04.2006Request for further processing filed
07.04.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.04.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB25.03.2008
FR31.03.2008
[2009/30]
Documents cited:Search[A]  - GEROTHANASSIS I P, "METHODS OF AVOIDING THE EFFECTS OF ACOUSTIC RINGING IN PULSED FOURIER TRANSFORM NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPY", PROGRESS IN NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (1987), vol. 19, no. PART 3, ISSN 0079-6565, pages 267 - 329, XP000607872 [A] 1-18 * see chapters 5 and 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0079-6565(87)80005-5
 [A]  - PRAMMER ET AL, "Measurements of clay-bound water and total porosity by magnetic resonance logging", SPE ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, Denver, Colorado, (19961006), pages 311 - 319, XP002164605 [A] 1-18 * see the whole document *
International search[XP]US5698979  (TAICHER GERSH ZVI [IL], et al);
 [A]US5389877  (SEZGINER ABDURRAHMAN [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.