blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979524

EP0979524 - INTEGRATED METALLIZATION FOR DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.02.2009  [2009/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2007/17]
Former [2001/46]For all designated states
Candescent Intellectual Property Services, Inc.
6320 San Ignacio Avenue
San Jose, CA 95119 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Candescent Technologies Corporation
6580 Via del Oro
San Jose, CA 95119 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEARN, Arthur, J.
10822 Wilkinson Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / HAVEN, Duane, A.
10246 Tyee Road
Umpqua, OR 97486 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/07]Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914286.424.03.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US05715
Priority number, dateUS1997084638630.04.1997         Original published format: US 846386
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9849705
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979524
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979524
Date:19.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01J5/00, H01J17/49, H01J29/90
[2002/42]
CPC:
H01J31/127 (EP,US); H01J5/00 (KR); H01J29/90 (EP,US);
H01J2329/90 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/07]H01J5/00, H01J17/49
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTER METALLISIEREN FÜR EINE ANZEIGE[2000/07]
English:INTEGRATED METALLIZATION FOR DISPLAYS[2000/07]
French:METALLISATION INTEGREE POUR DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Search fee paid 
25.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
08.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2007Fee for grant paid
06.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
06.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Licence(s)ID:01 00/exclusive
For:DE FR GB IE
Licencee:Candescent Technologies Corporation
6320 San Ignacio Avenue
San Jose, California 95119 / US
Date:11.09.2001
ID:02 00/not-exclusive
For:DE FR GB IE
Licencee:U.S. FEDERAL GOVERNMENT
-
- / US
Date:28.03.2003
[2007/51]
Former [2003/35]ID:01 00/exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:Candescent Technologies Corporation
6320 San Ignacio Avenue
San Jose, California 95119 / US
Date:11.09.2001
ID:02 00/not-exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:U.S. FEERAL GOVERNMENT
-
- / US
Date:28.03.2003
[2007/51]
Former [2001/47]ID:01 00/exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:Candescent Technologies Corporation
6320 San Ignacio Avenue
San Jose, California 95119 / US
Date:11.09.2001
[2003/35]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE24.03.2008
[2009/08]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5424605  (LOVOI PAUL A [US]) [Y] 1-9,13 * the whole document * * column 9, lines 32-54; figures 3,16 * * column 21, lines 12-31 *;
 [Y]US5612256  (STANSBURY DARRYL M [US]) [Y] 1-9,13 * the whole document * * column 4, lines 52-64; figure 5 * * column 7, lines 5-13 *;
 [Y]US5157304  (KANE ROBERT C [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,13 * the whole document * * column 3, lines 32-52; figure 3A *;
 [Y]EP0686991  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-9,13 * the whole document * * column 13, lines 7-23; figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]US5397719  (KIM SANG-SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9,13 * the whole document * * column 1, line 6 - column 5, line 27 *;
 [Y]US5359206  (YAMAMOTO HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9,13 * the whole document * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 40 *;
 [Y]EP0681328  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-9,13 * the whole document * * column 2, lines 32-44 * * column 1, lines 5-42 *;
 [Y]US5534743  (JONES GARY W [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 16, lines 10-17 * * column 19, lines 38-45 *;
 [PX]WO9722962  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1,9 * the whole document * * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 32 *
International search[Y]US5600203  (NAMIKAWA MAMORU [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5559399  (TANSKI WILLIAM J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5518805  (HO JACKSON H [US], et al);
 [A]US5175067  (TAYLOR WILLIAM J [US], et al);
 [Y]US4908546  (SHAFFER JOHN W [US], et al);
 [Y]US4824803  (US NATASHA [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.