blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969942

EP0969942 - REFRACTORY POUR TUBE WITH CAST PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2002  [2002/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY
500 Halle Building, 1228 Euclid Avenue Cleveland
Ohio 44115-1809 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY
500 Halle Building, 1228 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44115-1809 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HALL, Richard, G.
11082 Vaughn Road
Hiram, OH 44234 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Becker, Thomas, et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [2000/02]Parkes, Andrew John Aykroyd, et al
c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date98914288.024.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05717
Priority number, dateUS1997082280824.03.1997         Original published format: US 822808
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842465
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969942
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:B22D41/08
[2000/02]
CPC:
B22D41/50 (EP,US); B22D41/08 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:FEUERFESTES TAUCHROHR MIT GEGOSSENER PLATTE[2000/02]
English:REFRACTORY POUR TUBE WITH CAST PLATE[2000/02]
French:TUBE DE COULEE REFRACTAIRE A PLATEAU COULE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Search fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
10.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0198237  (STEIN REFRACTORIES [GB]) [X] 1,5,6,8,10,12,14,15,17,18 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]JPS61126957  ;
 [A]DE2727742  (DIDIER WERKE AG) [A] * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 4 *;
 [A]DE1937742  (DIDIER WERKE AG, et al) [A] * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861030), vol. 010, no. 320, Database accession no. (M - 530), & JP61126957 A 19860614 (KUROSAKI REFRACT CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]US5348202  (LEE STEPHEN J [GB]);
 [A]US5614121  (TERAO MASARU [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5691061  (HANSE ERIC [BE], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.