blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970564

EP0970564 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SLEW RATE AND IMPEDANCE COMPENSATING BUFFER CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
INTEL CORPORATION
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IIKBAHAR, Alper
371-F Western Drive
Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US
02 / KLEVELAND, Bendik
1240 Thurston Avenue
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
[2000/28]
Former [2000/02]01 / IIKBAHAR, Alper
371-F Western Drive
Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US
02 / KLEVELAND, Bendik
350 Curtner Avenue 19
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Representative(s)Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote
40- 43 Chancery Lane
London
WC2A 1JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JA / GB
Former [2001/36]Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al
Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn
London WC2A 2AZ / GB
Former [2000/02]Molyneaux, Martyn William
Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6RR / GB
Application number, filing date98914296.320.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05802
Priority number, dateUS1997082406624.03.1997         Original published format: US 824066
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843352
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970564
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970564
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2000
ClassificationIPC:H03K19/094, H03K19/0185, H03K17/16, H03K19/00
[2000/44]
CPC:
H03K17/164 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/02]H03K19/094, H03K19/0185, H03K17/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ANSTIEGSZEIT- UND IMPEDANZKOMPENSIERUNGVONPUFFERSCHALTUNGEN[2000/02]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SLEW RATE AND IMPEDANCE COMPENSATING BUFFER CIRCUITS[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMPENSATION DE LA VITESSE DE BALAYAGE ET DE L'IMPEDANCE DE CIRCUITS TAMPONS[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Search fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2004Fee for grant paid
25.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.06.2004
[2006/32]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0752677  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,14,15,17,18 * column 4, lines 49-52; figure 1; claims 4,6 * * column 5, line 30 - line 32; claims 15,17,27,29 * * column 6, line 13 - column 8, line 5; figure 4A *[A] 7,9-11,13
International search[Y]US4719369  (ASANO MICHIO [JP], et al);
 [X]US5013940  (ANSEL GEORGE M [US]);
 [Y]US5216289  (HAHN MICHAEL G [US], et al);
 [Y]US5231311  (FERRY THOMAS V [US], et al);
 [Y]US5568081  (LUI HENRY Y [US], et al);
 [Y]US5594371  (DOUSEKI TAKAKUNI [JP]);
 [Y]US5602494  (SUNDSTROM LANCE L [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.