blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970539

EP0970539 - DUAL-BAND HELICAL ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2010  [2010/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
6455 Lusk Boulevard
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FILIPOVIC, Daniel
3863 Ingraham Street E-306
San Diego, CA 92109 / US
02 / TASSOUDJI, Ali
5240 Fiore Terrace 202
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
03 / TIDWELL, Stephen, B.
3280 Maezel Lane
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914307.825.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05869
Priority number, dateUS1997082628927.03.1997         Original published format: US 826289
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9844589
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970539
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01Q11/08
[2000/02]
CPC:
H01Q21/28 (EP,US); H01Q11/08 (EP,KR,US); H01Q1/362 (EP,US);
H01Q5/378 (EP,US); H01Q5/40 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:DOPPELBANDIGE WENDELANTENNE[2000/02]
English:DUAL-BAND HELICAL ANTENNA[2000/02]
French:ANTENNE HELICOIDALE A DEUX BANDES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2009
25.06.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/23]
27.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/23]
Request for further processing for:17.01.2007Request for further processing filed
17.01.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0757406  (GLOBALSTAR LP [US]) [A] 1,28 * column 4, lines 24-34 * * column 4, line 47 - column 6, line 10 * * column 6, lines 17-35 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 28; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]EP0320404  (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 42; figure 3 *;
 [DA]US5541617  (CONNOLLY PETER J [US], et al) [DA] 1 * figures 1-5 *;
 [PX]EP0805513  (TRW INC [US]) [PX] 1,6-10,14,16,28 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5198831  (BURRELL GARY L [US], et al) [DA] * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US5479180  (LENZING ERIK H [US], et al) [A] * figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.