EP0977934 - CONNECTOR TUBE FOR LINKING A COLD PLENUM TO A HOT CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADDER, James, L. 6525 E. Redfield Road Scottsdale, AZ 85254 / US | 02 /
LAWRENCE, Kyle, A. 2101 N. Central Drive Chandler, AZ 85224 / US | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98914389.6 | 01.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998US06396 | Priority number, date | US19970042019P | 17.04.1997 Original published format: US 42019 P | US19980046480 | 23.03.1998 Original published format: US 46480 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846861 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977934 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/06, F02C7/20 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
F01D9/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/06] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSROHR UM EINEN KALTEN SAMMELRAUM MIT EINEM HEISSRAUM ZU VERBINDEN | [2000/06] | English: | CONNECTOR TUBE FOR LINKING A COLD PLENUM TO A HOT CHAMBER | [2000/06] | French: | RACCORD POUR RELIER UNE CHAMBRE DE DISTRIBUTION D'AIR FROID A UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/20] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.12.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 | 03.12.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 | 03.12.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 | 03.12.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 | 03.12.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.12.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH254137 (POWER JETS RES & DEV LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 41 - line 77; figure 2 *; | [A]GB638283 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 128 - page 4, line 50; figure 3 *; | [A]US2592372 (ALTORFER HANS A); | [A]GB790248 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *; | [XA]FR2199844 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * page 1, line 9 - line 14 * * page 5, line 10 - line 26; figure 1 * [A] 3; | [A]GB2063189 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4772033 (NASH DUDLEY O [US]); | [A]WO9206333 (RUSTON GAS TURBINES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 8 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]US5265412 (BAGEPALLI BHARAT S [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 33; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US5572862 |