blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974070

EP0974070 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING CHARACTERISTICS OF CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester
New York 14604-2701 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place
Rochester, New York 14604-2701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / APPLETON, William, J.
521 Hoffman Road
Rochester, NY 14622 / US
02 / CRONK, William, B., IV
Apartment T-248,2700 North Brook Drive
McKinney, TX 75070 / US
03 / ALTOBELLI, Kathleen, M.
1171 Sherbrooke Lane
Rochester, NY 14624 / US
04 / GABRIEL, Emily, Abrams
39 Saddle Brook
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
05 / MISITI, Paul, D.
18 Vick Park B
Rochester, NY 14607 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Bowman, Paul Alan, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Bowman, Paul Alan, et al
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date98914455.502.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06564
Priority number, dateUS19970043908P07.04.1997         Original published format: US 43908 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9845750
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974070
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974070
Date:29.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:G02C7/04, G02C7/02
[2000/04]
CPC:
G02C7/048 (EP,US); G02C7/04 (EP,KR,US); G02C7/021 (EP,US);
G02C2202/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIEZIERUNG DER KONTAKTLINSENCHARAKTERISTIKEN[2000/04]
English:METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING CHARACTERISTICS OF CONTACT LENSES[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DES CARACTERISTIQUES DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999National basic fee paid 
04.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
08.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2001Fee for grant paid
04.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2425088  (SPOFA VEREINIGTE PHARMA WERKE [CS]) [A] 1,4,6 * claim - *;
 [A]US4193671  (ERICKSON CHARLES E [US], et al) [A] 1,4,9 * column 1, line 48 - column 4, line 21 *;
 [DA]US4194814  (FISCHER DAVID J [US], et al) [DA] 1,2 * column 1 - column 2, line 16 *;
 [A]US4268133  (FISCHER DAVID J, et al) [A] 1,4,6,7,9 * column 5, line 41 - column 7, line 40 *;
 [A]US4525044  (BAUMAN ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0346032  (SCHERING CORP [US]) [DA] 1* column 6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.