14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
25.05.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
23.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
07.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
19.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
29.07.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
27.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
20.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
11.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
28.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
21.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
06.08.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.02.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.09.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.06.2002 |
First examination report |
|
07.06.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
07.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.05.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
20.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.02.2001 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
20.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
17.12.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
23.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|