EP0973390 - RETINOID RELATED MOLECULES FOR THE INHIBITION OF ENDOTHELIN-1 OVERPRODUCTION IN DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIDNEY KIMMEL CANCER CENTER 10835 Altman Row San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2000/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFAHL, Magnus 605 North Rios Avenue Solano Beach, CA 92075 / US | 02 /
HSU, Ju-YU 3520 Lebanon Drive 5123 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Arnulfstrasse 27 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98914647.7 | 10.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US07125 | Priority number, date | US19970043293P | 11.04.1997 Original published format: US 43293 P | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846076 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973390 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/10, A61K31/19, A61K31/335, A61K31/385, A61K31/38, A61K31/34 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/203 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/04] | A01N37/10, A61K31/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | MIT RETINOIDEN VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG KRANKHAFTER ENDOTHELIN-1-ÜBERPRODUKTION | [2000/04] | English: | RETINOID RELATED MOLECULES FOR THE INHIBITION OF ENDOTHELIN-1 OVERPRODUCTION IN DISEASE | [2000/04] | French: | MOLECULES LIEES AUX RETINOIDES ET PERMETTANT D'ENRAYER LA SURPRODUCTION D'ENDOTHELINE 1 DANS L'AFFECTION | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 24.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/47] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9321146 (LIGAND PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-15,17,18,20,21,25,27 * abstract * * page 2, lines 3-16 * * page 10, line 34 - page 11, line 2 * * page 13, lines 25-28; example 2 * * page 59, line 3 - page 60, line 21; claims 1-41 *; | [X]EP0749752 (CIRD GALDERMA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-13,25,27 * abstract * * page 3, lines 23-46 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 34; examples 1,2; claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [X]US5324840 (CHANDRARATNA ROSHANTHA A S [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 46; claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0747347 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 11 * * page 7, line 53 - page 8, line 30; claims 1-22 *; | [X]US5455265 (CHANDRARATNA ROSHANTHA A S [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, lines 32-64 * * column 18, line 62 - column 22, line 25; claims 1-11 *; | [X]EP0694301 (CIRD GALDERMA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-13,25,27 * abstract * * column 6, lines 8-21; claims 1-12 *; | [X] - NAKAJIMA, MOTOWO ET AL, "Inhibition by retinoic acid of type IV collagenolysis and invasion through reconstituted basement membrane by metastatic rat mammary adenocarcinoma cells", CANCER RES. ( 1989 ), 49(7), 1698-706, XP008008736 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 1703, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1705, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 6; table 5 * | [X] - GOTTARDIS, MARCO M. ET AL, "Chemoprevention of mammary carcinoma by LGD1069 (Targretin): an RXR-selective ligand", CANCER RESEARCH ( 1996 ), 56(24), 5566-5570, XP001108852 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - DAWSON ET AL, "Conformational Effects on Retinoid Receptor Selectivity. 2. Effects of Retinoid Bridging Group on Retinoid X Receptor Activity and Selectivity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (1995), vol. 38, no. 17, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3368 - 3383, XP002148373 [X] 1,2,5-13,25,27 * abstract * * page 3368, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 3369, column 1, paragraph 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00017a021 | [X] - LOPEZ-BOADO, YOLANDA S. ET AL, "Retinoic acid-induced expression of apolipoprotein D and concomitant growth arrest in human breast cancer cells are mediated through a retinoic acid receptor RAR.alpha.-dependent signaling pathway", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY ( 1996 ), 271(50), 32105-32111, XP001115034 [X] 1,2,5-13,20,21,25,27 * abstract * * page 32105, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 32106, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 32107, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 32108, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.50.32105 | [X] - BOEHM M F ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE - ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS OF NOVEL RETINOID X RECEPTOR-SELECTIVE RETINOIDS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19940902), vol. 37, no. 18, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2930 - 2941, XP000615432 [X] 1,2,5-13,25,27 * abstract * * page 2930, column 1, paragraph 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00044a014 | [X] - BOEHM M F ET AL, "DESIGN AND SYNTHESIS OF POTENT RETINOID X RECEPTOR SELECTIVE LIGANDS THAT INDUCE APOPTOSIS IN LEUKEMIA CELLS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19950804), vol. 38, no. 16, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3146 - 3155, XP000615461 [X] 1,2,5-13,25,27 * abstract * * page 3146, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 3147, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00016a018 | International search | [XP]WO97 | [XP] - STN WPIDS, (19000101), Database accession no. 97-145349, XP002910025 & WO97 A 00000000 |