blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979213

EP0979213 - PROCESS FOR PURIFYING WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zenon Technology Partnership
The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Centre 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[2007/17]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC.
845 Harrington Court
Burlington, Ontario L7N 3P3 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / BENEDEK, Andrew
845 Harrington Court
Burlington, Ontario L7N 3P3 / CA
02 / HUSAIN, Hadi
845 Harrington Court
Burlington, Ontario L7N 3P3 / CA
03 / SINGH, Manwinder
845 Harrington Court
Burlington, Ontario L7N 3P3 / CA
04 / FRENKEL, Vyacheslav
845 Harrington Court
Burlington, Ontario L7N 3P3 / CA
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/07]Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914730.101.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998CA00299
Priority number, dateUS19970043808P14.04.1997         Original published format: US 43808 P
US1997094408204.10.1997         Original published format: US 944082
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846533
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979213
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C02F1/52, C02F1/44, C02F9/00
[2000/07]
CPC:
B01D65/08 (EP,US); B01D61/145 (EP,US); B01D61/147 (EP,US);
B01D61/16 (EP,US); C02F1/444 (EP,US); C02F1/52 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US); B01D2321/04 (EP,US); B01D2321/185 (EP,US);
B01D2321/2075 (EP,US); B01D2321/30 (EP,US); C02F1/283 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON WASSER[2000/07]
English:PROCESS FOR PURIFYING WATER[2000/07]
French:PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'EAU[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
10.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
02.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/23]
11.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/23]
Request for further processing for:06.03.2002Request for further processing filed
06.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.04.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0421399  (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-31 * column 2, line 24 - column 6, line 37 *;
 [A]JPH0760248  ;
 [A]US4610792  (VAN GILS GERARD J [US], et al);
 [A]US5514282  (HIBBARD DAVID C [US], et al)
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 18, Database accession no. 95-136154, XP002074001 & JPH0760248 A 00000000 (TAKUMA KK) [A] 1-31 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.