EP0962084 - RADIO APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDNER, Wolfgang Berliner Strasse 8a D-61348 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
MURGAS, Hans Hölderlinstrasse 40 D-61462 Königstein / DE | 03 /
KLEIN, Bernt Alteburgstrasse 6a D-65812 Bad Soden / DE | [1999/49] | Application number, filing date | 98914781.4 | 18.02.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998DE00482 | Priority number, date | DE1997106595 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706595 | [1999/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837681 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962084 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962084 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
H04M1/72466 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (KR);
H04B1/401 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/49] | Title | German: | FUNKGERÄT | [1999/49] | English: | RADIO APPARATUS | [1999/49] | French: | APPAREIL RADIOTELEPHONIQUE | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 04.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0470403 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [XAY]EP0633684 (US WEST TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 9; figures 5-13 * [A] 2 [Y] 4; | [X]CH686541 (PEIKER ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0731590 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9729582 (SPRINT TELECOMMUNICATIONS VENT [US]) [PX] 1-3,5-8* page 4, line 2 - page 7, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [X] - ANDREASEN L ET AL, "ADSI: THE DAWN OF A NEW AGE OF INTERACTIVE SERVICES", TELESIS, (199312), no. 97, pages 35 - 50, XP000616855 [X] 1-8 * page 42, column 2, line 16 - page 44, column 2, line 10 * * siehe Diagram A, Diagram B * |