EP0965162 - BASE PLATE, PARTICULARLY FOR ELECTRICAL MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EULE, Andreas-Alexander Kilianstrasse 70 D-90425 Nürnberg / DE | [1999/51] | Application number, filing date | 98914807.7 | 23.02.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998DE00535 | Priority number, date | DE1997109222 | 06.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19709222 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9839834 | Date: | 11.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965162 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965162 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/24, F16F15/32 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
F16F15/32 (EP,US);
H02K5/24 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/51] | Title | German: | LAGERSCHILD, INSBESONDERE FÜR ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINEN | [1999/51] | English: | BASE PLATE, PARTICULARLY FOR ELECTRICAL MACHINES | [1999/51] | French: | FLASQUE, NOTAMMENT POUR MACHINES ELECTRIQUES | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08107655 ; | [A]JPH02271138 ; | [A]JPS5728542 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, & JP08107655 A 19960423 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910125), vol. 015, no. 032, Database accession no. (M - 1073), & JP02271138 A 19901106 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820603), vol. 006, no. 095, Database accession no. (E - 110), & JP57028542 A 19820216 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |