blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973667

EP0973667 - HYDRAULIC STEERING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sauer-Danfoss Holding ApS
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
[2004/31]
Former [2002/19]For all designated states
Sauer-Danfoss Holding A/S
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
Sauer-Danfoss (Nordeborg) A/S
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Danfoss Fluid Power A/S
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Danfoss A/S
6430 Nordborg / DK
Inventor(s)01 / PEISTRUP, Peter, Gade
Valmuevej 12
DK-6430 Nordborg / DK
02 / JENSEN, John, Borsting
Rypevej 6
DK-6430 Nordborg / DK
03 / KRISTENSEN, John
Frejasvej 6
DK-6400 Sonderborg / DK
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Nissen, Georg
Danfoss Universe A/S
Mads Patent Vej 1
6430 Nordborg / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Nissen, Georg
c/o Danfoss A/G, Patent Department
6430 Nordborg / DK
Application number, filing date98914838.206.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998DK00138
Priority number, dateDE199711478510.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19714785
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9845155
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973667
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973667
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B62D5/08
[2000/04]
CPC:
B62D5/32 (EP,US); B62D5/09 (EP,US); B62D5/093 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE LENKEINRICHTUNG[2000/04]
English:HYDRAULIC STEERING ARRANGEMENT[2000/04]
French:AGENCEMENT A DIRECTION HYDRAULIQUE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
30.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2004Fee for grant paid
23.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE22.03.2005
GB06.04.2005
[2007/17]
Former [2006/13]GB06.04.2005
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4023363  (LIEBERT KARL-HEINZ);
 [Y]US4311006  (BECKER LANSON);
 [Y]US4553390  (LIEBERT KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al);
 [Y]DE3732662  (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.